Berg v. Dakota County Sheriff's Office, The
Defendant: Dakota County Sheriff's Department, The
Petitioner: David A. Berg
Case Number: 0:2019cv02822
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by David A. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/17/2019. (JMK)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Dakota County Sheriff's Department, The Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Frank, Matthew)
November 6, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Corrected Exhibit 2 (4 pages in original Exhibit 2 missing) by David A. Berg. (Knaak, Frederic)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2822 ECT/NEB. (KDS)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Knaak, Frederic) Modified text on 11/4/2019 (KDS).
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $ 5, receipt number AMNDC-7245759) filed by David A Berg. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) District Court Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Federal Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) Mn. Court of Appeals Order) (Knaak, Frederic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. Dakota County Sheriff's Office, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota County Sheriff's Department, The
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David A. Berg
Represented By: Frederic W Knaak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?