Surratt v. ADT LLC of Delaware
Plaintiff: Desarae Surratt
Defendant: ADT LLC of Delaware
Case Number: 0:2019cv02833
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 12/30/2019. (LLM)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Cancelling Pretrial Conference, scheduled for 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/27/2019. (JMK)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2019 re #5 First MOTION to Stay filed by ADT LLC of Delaware; ORAL ORDER denying #5 Motion to Stay. (Court Reporter Lynne Krenz) (ALM)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel S. Blynn for ADT LLC of Delaware. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/11/2019. (NAH)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel S. Blynn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7326386 filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. (Koob, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 First MOTION to Stay filed by Desarae Surratt. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hartz, Bennett)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Stay filed by ADT LLC of Delaware.(Koob, David)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/26/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court has reviewed the e-mail request from Plaintiff's counsel regarding an extension of time for Plaintiff to respond to #5 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Given that the hearing in this matter is scheduled for Thursday, December 12, 2019, the time for Plaintiff to file her response to the motion shall be extended to and including December 6, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/27/2019. (JMK)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Motion to Stay #5 Motion to Stay. (Koob, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 First MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Koob, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Thomas Woods in Support of #5 First MOTION to Stay filed by ADT LLC of Delaware.(Koob, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Daniel S. Blynn in Support of #5 First MOTION to Stay filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Blynn Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 to Blynn Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3 to Blynn Declaration)(Koob, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT Exhibit 1 to Memorandum re #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3 to Memorandum)(Koob, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 First MOTION to Stay filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate LR 7.1(f) Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Koob, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Stay filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. (Koob, David)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 ADT LLC of Delaware, dba ADT Security Services' ANSWER to Complaint filed by ADT LLC of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Koob, David)
November 6, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014.(JEP)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2833 PAM/HB. (CLK)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7250804) filed by ADT LLC of Delaware d/b/a ADT Security Services. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Koob, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surratt v. ADT LLC of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desarae Surratt
Represented By: Bennett Hartz
Represented By: Andrew C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC of Delaware
Represented By: David J Koob
Represented By: Daniel S. Blynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?