Dedicated Networks, Inc. v. TrueIT, LLC
Plaintiff: Dedicated Networks, Inc.
Defendant: TrueIT, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02835
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER on #20 Stipulation. Defendant's Motionto Dismiss due by 1/24/2020. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/17/2019. (KAT)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 Stipulation. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #16 Pretrial Conference - Initial, #18 Scheduling Order, by Dedicated Networks, Inc.. Jointly Signed by TrueIT, LLC.. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by TrueIT, LLC re #6 Notice of Hearing on Motion of Partial Motion to Dismiss (Sater, Jesse)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/3/2020. Fact Discovery due by 8/31/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/7/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 9/14/2020. Motions (disp) due by 2/8/2021. Ready for trial due by 5/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/12/2019. (KAT)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/10/2019. (KAT)
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/10/2019. Scheduling Order to be issued. (KAT)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Dedicated Networks, Inc.. Jointly Signed by TrueIT, LLC..(Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. DNI Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Dedicated Networks, Inc.. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against TrueIT, LLC. filed by Dedicated Networks, Inc.. No summons requested. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin O. Dungan on behalf of Dedicated Networks, Inc.. (Dungan, Erin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Dedicated Networks, Inc.. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TrueIT, LLC.(Sater, Jesse)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by TrueIT, LLC.(Sater, Jesse)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TrueIT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) 1)(Sater, Jesse)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Sater, Jesse)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TrueIT, LLC. (Sater, Jesse)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/7/2019. (CLB)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (KAT)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2835 (DSD/KMM). (lmb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Hennepin (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7251083) filed by TrueIT, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sater, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dedicated Networks, Inc. v. TrueIT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TrueIT, LLC
Represented By: Jesse E Sater
Represented By: Alana K Bassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dedicated Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin R Skjold
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Erin O. Dungan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?