Hatton et al v. Harpstead et al
Plaintiff: Peter Allan, Russell Hatton and Michael Benson
Defendant: Christine Sell, Sharon Olson, Mark Deutsch, Jodi Harpstead, Sandra Bryant, Nancy Johnston, Chad Mesojedec, Nick Lammi, Kathryn Schesso, Kevin Moser and Ann Zimmerman
Case Number: 0:2019cv02837
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra Bryant, Mark Deutsch, Jodi Harpstead, Nancy Johnston, Nick Lammi, Chad Mesojedec, Kevin Moser, Sharon Olson, Kathryn Schesso, Christine Sell, Ann Zimmerman re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Plaintiffs' Complaint), #14 Notice of Appearance, #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #16 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #19 Proposed Order to Judge, #18 Meet and Confer Statement, (Clark III, James)
December 23, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by Sandra Bryant, Mark Deutsch, Jodi Harpstead, Nancy Johnston, Nick Lammi, Chad Mesojedec, Kevin Moser, Sharon Olson, Kathryn Schesso, Christine Sell, Ann Zimmerman.(Clark III, James)
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion to Dismiss/General, filed by Sandra Bryant, Mark Deutsch, Jodi Harpstead, Nancy Johnston, Nick Lammi, Chad Mesojedec, Kevin Moser, Sharon Olson, Kathryn Schesso, Christine Sell, Ann Zimmerman.(Clark III, James)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by Sandra Bryant, Mark Deutsch, Jodi Harpstead, Nancy Johnston, Nick Lammi, Chad Mesojedec, Kevin Moser, Sharon Olson, Kathryn Schesso, Christine Sell, Ann Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Clark III, James)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Plaintiffs' Complaint) : Date and time to be determined. (Clark III, James)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Plaintiffs' Complaint) filed by Sandra Bryant, Mark Deutsch, Jodi Harpstead, Nancy Johnston, Nick Lammi, Chad Mesojedec, Kevin Moser, Sharon Olson, Kathryn Schesso, Christine Sell, Ann Zimmerman. (Clark III, James)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James H Clark III on behalf of Sandra Bryant, Mark Deutsch, Jodi Harpstead, Nancy Johnston, Nick Lammi, Chad Mesojedec, Kevin Moser, Sharon Olson, Kathryn Schesso, Christine Sell, Ann Zimmerman. (Clark III, James)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Benson, Peter Allan, Russell Hatton. Sandra Bryant served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Mark Deutsch served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Jodi Harpstead served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Nancy Johnston served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Nick Lammi served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Chad Mesojedec served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Kevin Moser served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Sharon Olson served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Kathryn Schesso served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Christine Sell served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Ann Zimmerman served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (CLK). Qc'd on 12/27/2019 (KNK).
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendant Chad Mesojedec. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 12/26/2019. (kt)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendants Jodi Harpstead, Kevin Moser, Nancy Johnson, Kathryn Schesso, Ann Zimmerman, Sandra Bryant, Sharon Olson, Christine Sell, Nick Lammi, and Mark Deutsch. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 12/26/2019. (kt)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Chad Mesojedec. (MTP)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Sandra Bryant, Mark Deutsch, Jodi Harpstead, Nancy Johnston, Nick Lammi, Kevin Moser, Sharon Olson, Kathryn Schesso, Christine Sell, Ann Zimmerman. (MTP) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (MTP).
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk's Office re: Order Granting IFP and enclosing USM Forms to Complete cc: Russell Hatton, Peter Allan, and Michael Benson with USM forms. (MTP) Modified text on 11/20/2019 (MTP).
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT NOT ATTACHED. LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Russell Hatton, Peter Allan, and Michael Benson. (MTP) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (MTP).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs of Russell Hatton; granting #3 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs of Peter Allan; granting #4 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs of Michael Benson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/12/2019. (JMK)
November 6, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Peter Allan, Michael Benson, Russell Hatton re #1 Complaint, #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Peter Allan, #4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michael Benson, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Russell Hatton (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/25/2019 (KMH).
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michael Benson. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/25/2019 (KMH).
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Peter Allan. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/25/2019 (KMH).
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Russell Hatton. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/25/2019 (KMH).
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sandra Bryant, Mark Deutsch, Jodi Harpstead, Nancy Johnston, Nick Lammi, Chad Mesojedec, Kevin Moser, Sharon Olson, Kathryn Schesso, Christine Sell, Ann Zimmerman filed by Michael Benson, Peter Allan, Russell Hatton. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/25/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatton et al v. Harpstead et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Sell
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Olson
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Deutsch
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Harpstead
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Bryant
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Johnston
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Mesojedec
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Lammi
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Schesso
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Moser
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Zimmerman
Represented By: James H Clark III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Hatton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?