Weisen v. Northern Tier Retail LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Defendant: Agree Bloomington, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC and Agree Bloomington MN, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02884
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: denying #14 Motion for More Definite Statement; Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2020 re #14 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC. (SDF)
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Jeffrey Weisen.(Michenfelder, Patrick)
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Patrick W. Michenfelder in Opposition to #14 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Jeffrey Weisen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Michenfelder, Patrick)
December 17, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Jeffrey Weisen. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Michenfelder, Patrick)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC. (Olson, Daniel)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC.(Olson, Daniel)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olson, Daniel)
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #14 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC.(Olson, Daniel)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION for More Definite Statement : Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Olson, Daniel)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC. (Olson, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Skemp, Brittany)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC. filed by Jeffrey Weisen. No summons requested. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
November 25, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Agree Limited Partnership is a corporate parent of Defendant Agree Bloomington MN, LLC. (Olson, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC.(Olson, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Daniel R. Olson in Support of #4 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-H)(Olson, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Erin Moosbrugger in Support of #4 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Olson, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Olson, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC.(Olson, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION for More Definite Statement : Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Olson, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Agree Bloomington MN, LLC, Northern Tier Retail LLC. (Olson, Daniel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2884 (WMW/ECW). (KNK)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Northern Tier Retail Holdings LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Northern Tier Retail LLC. (Olson, Daniel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number none assigned yet (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7267106) filed by Northern Tier Retail LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit of Service) (Olson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisen v. Northern Tier Retail LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agree Bloomington, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Tier Retail LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Olson
Represented By: Jessica L. Kometz
Represented By: Stephen O Plunkett
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agree Bloomington MN, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Olson
Represented By: Jessica L. Kometz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?