Stauty v. Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Plaintiff: Larry R. Stauty, Jr.
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02903
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURES Certificate of Service by Wisconsin Central Ltd..(Gelhar, Leslie)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Wisconsin Central Ltd.. Jointly Signed by Larry R. Stauty, Jr..(Gelhar, Leslie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie A Gelhar on behalf of Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Gelhar, Leslie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Grand Trunk Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Gelhar, Leslie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand filed by Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Gelhar, Leslie)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Larry R. Stauty, Jr Affidavit of Service on RR (LeNeave, Cortney)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Central Ltd. (CLK)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2903 PJS/LIB. (CLK)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wisconsin Central Ltd., a Delaware corporation, d/b/a Canadian National Railway Company, a foreign corporation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7273411) filed by Larry R. Stauty. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (LeNeave, Cortney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stauty v. Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry R. Stauty, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas W Fuller
Represented By: Cortney S LeNeave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Represented By: Julius W Gernes
Represented By: Leslie A Gelhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?