Labey v. Synchrony Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Gina Labey
Defendant: Synchrony Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02911
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gina Labey re: Resolution of Claims. (Hartz, Bennett)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Synchrony Bank, N.A. answer due 1/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/12/2019. (JMK)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Unopposed) filed by Synchrony Bank, N.A..(Olson, Cory)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Synchrony Bank, N.A..(Olson, Cory)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Unopposed) filed by Synchrony Bank, N.A.. (Olson, Cory)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #5 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Synchrony Bank, N.A. answer due 12/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/18/2019. (JMK)
November 15, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Olson, Cory)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Synchrony Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Gina Labey. (Olson, Cory)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2911 (JRT/HB). (MKB) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (MKB).
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Synchrony Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Olson, Cory)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Synchrony Financial is a corporate parent of Defendant Synchrony Bank, N.A.. (Olson, Cory)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7276694) filed by Synchrony Bank, N.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exs. A-B, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Ex. C, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labey v. Synchrony Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Labey
Represented By: Bennett Hartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Cory D Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?