Thomas v. Henry et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Thomas and Kelly Ann Thomas
Defendant: Carl Puglises, Sean Henry, Culpepper Plumbing and Airconditioning Inc., Gerald Turnham and J.L. Culpepper
Case Number: 0:2019cv02930
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
2 Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/15/2020. (MSK)
January 6, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kelly Ann Thomas exhibit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Thomas, Kelly)
January 6, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kelly Ann Thomas Complaint. (Thomas, Kelly)
December 30, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Kelly Ann Thomas. (Thomas, Kelly)
December 30, 2019 Filing 20 EXHIBIT Clerks took a filingg from 18:3491 and inserted it into IFP as an exhibit / clear error re #16 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs Correction of Number 5 Corrected filed by Kelly Ann Thomas filed by Kelly Ann Thomas.(Thomas, Kelly)
December 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Kelly Ann Thomas Clerk Clear Error,Clerk Takes Declaration of Service of SummonsExhibit 18-1 in case number 18:3491 and shows it as Plaintiff's Letter of Explanation which is doc 18 in this case My Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Thomas, Kelly)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 EXPLAINATION re #16 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kelly Ann Thomas. (Thomas, Kelly) Modified text on 12/27/2019 (lmb).
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Kelly Ann Thomas WITHDRAWAL (Thomas, Kelly)
December 15, 2019 Filing 16 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs Correction of Number 5 Corrected filed by Kelly Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Thomas, Kelly)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT 2019 Social Security Befefit form ssa-4926SM-DI(1-2019) re #9 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs In Previous Motion Clerk stamped Bankruptcy Case. There is Not a Bankruptcy Case filed by Kelly Ann Thomas, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kelly Thomas, #5 Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by Kelly Ann Thomas.(Thomas, Kelly)
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant J.L. Culpepper only by Kelly Ann Thomas re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Notice Rule 60)(Thomas, Kelly) Modified text on 12/11/2019 (lmb).
December 7, 2019 Filing 13 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint,. (Thomas, Kelly) Modified text on 12/9/2019 (MMP).
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Kelly Ann Thomas. (Thomas, Kelly)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Kelly Ann Thomas re #10 MOTION for Discovery copied to both cases per instruction /premature in this case copied conversation with clerk explaination (Thomas, Kelly)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Discovery copied to both cases per instruction /premature in this case filed by Kelly Ann Thomas. (Thomas, Kelly)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Second Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs In Previous Motion Clerk stamped Bankruptcy Case. There is Not a Bankruptcy Case with attached Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by Kelly Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Thomas, Kelly) Modified text on 12/3/2019 (MMP).
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - SUPPLEMENT (NOT Motion) Correction pg 2 and Note of explaination- clarifying the intent # 9 re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kelly Thomas filed by Kelly Ann Thomas, #1 Complaint, filed by Kelly Ann Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Thomas, Kelly) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (MMP).
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Sean Henry, Gerald Turnham, Carl Puglises, Culpepper Plumbing & Airconditioning Inc. J.L.Culpepper Kelly Ann Thomas. (Thomas, Kelly)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #4 Clerk's Notice - Application for Pro Se E-Filer, #1 Complaint, Notice of Docketing Correction, #3 Order Reassigning Case,. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint)(Thomas, Kelly)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Kelly Thomas in SUPPORT OF #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kelly Thomas filed by Kelly Ann Thomas.(Thomas, Kelly)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Kelly Thomas is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Kelly Thomas has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2930 (JRT/BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 11/25/2019. (lmb)
November 22, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Complaint, Rescanned complaint without blank pages. (JGK)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kelly Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JGK) Document QC'd on 12/10/2019 by LPH (LPH).
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Culpepper Plumbing and Airconditioning Inc., Sean Henry, Carl Puglises, Gerald Turnham filed by Kelly Thomas. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (JGK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #3 Rescanned complaint without blank pages) (JGK). Modified text on 11/22/2019 (JGK). Document QC'd on 12/10/2019 by LPH (LPH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Henry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Ann Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Puglises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culpepper Plumbing and Airconditioning Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Turnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.L. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?