Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc. v. All These Things, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.
Defendant: Bradley Mitchell, Anitra Mitchell, All These Things, LLC, Charlotte Cooper Parris, Grace And Love, LLC and CCP, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv02953
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 1/23/2020. Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/17/2020. (HAM)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 (Text-Only) ORDER re #47 Letter to District Judge. In Response to Mr. Dady's letter, and in light of the fact that the motions are interrelated, the Court will allow 20 minutes of argument per side per motion at the January 17th hearing. Ordered by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/16/2020. (SMD)
January 16, 2020 Filing 47 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris . (Dady, J)
January 15, 2020 Filing 46 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General Affidavit of Anitra Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Dady, J)
January 13, 2020 Filing 45 Reply to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dady, J)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Maisa Jean Frank for Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/13/2020. (NAH)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General. Defendants' Reply is now due Monday, January 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/9/2020. (JTJ)
January 9, 2020 Filing 42 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A ONE BUSINESS DAY EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,. (Dady, J)
January 9, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. (Dady, J)
January 9, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maisa Jean Frank. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7388585 filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.. (Miller, Craig)
January 9, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc. of Change of Email Address and Firm Name (Miller, Craig)
December 30, 2019 Filing 38 Supplemental Declaration of Corey DeNicola in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit Q, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit R, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit S, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit T, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit U, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit V)(Miller, Craig)
December 30, 2019 Filing 37 Reply to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Miller, Craig)
December 27, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Miller, Craig)
December 16, 2019 Filing 35 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Dady, J)
December 16, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Anitra Mitchell in OPPOSITION TO #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Dady, J)
December 16, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Brad Mitchell in OPPOSITION TO #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris.(Dady, J)
December 16, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of J. Michael Dady in OPPOSITION TO #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7)(Dady, J)
December 16, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dady, J)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER on #28 Stipulation re: Briefing Schedule for #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/13/2019. (SMD)
December 12, 2019 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #28 Stipulation,. (Miamen, Kristy)
December 12, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. Jointly Signed by MAINSTREAM FASHIONS FRANCHISING, INC.. (Miamen, Kristy)
December 11, 2019 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris.(Dady, J)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/9/2019. (HAM)
December 6, 2019 Filing 25 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #21 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris.(Dady, J)
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of J. Michael Dady in SUPPORT OF #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Dady, J)
December 6, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dady, J)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Dady, J)
December 6, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. (Dady, J)
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Zaiger on behalf of All Defendants. (Zaiger, Rachel)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristy Lynn Miamen on behalf of All Defendants. (Miamen, Kristy)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by J Michael Dady on behalf of All Defendants. (Dady, J)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc. All These Things, LLC, served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; CCP, LLC, served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Grace And Love, LLC, served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Anitra Mitchell served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Bradley Mitchell served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Charlotte Cooper Parris served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Miller, Craig) Modified text/added dates of service and answer due dates on 12/2/2019 (lmb).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/NOTICE: Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for January 17, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Any dispositive motion filed by Defendant shall also be heard at the same time, so long as that motion is filed no later than 42 days prior to the hearing date. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/26/2019. (KLL)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE/OBJECTION re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amd Demand for Arbitration, #2 Exhibit(s) Amd Demand - Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit(s) Amd Demand - Exhibits 2 - 4, #4 Exhibit(s) Amd Demand - Exhibits 5 - 14, #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s))(Dady, J) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (lmb).
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris.(Dady, J)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2953 (SRN/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/25/2019. (lmb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc. . (Miller, Craig)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc..(Miller, Craig)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc..(Miller, Craig)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Craig Miller in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-3)(Miller, Craig)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Corey DeNicola in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-P)(Miller, Craig)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Miller, Craig)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Miller, Craig)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.. (Miller, Craig)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All These Things, LLC, CCP, LLC, Grace And Love, LLC, Anitra Mitchell, Bradley Mitchell, Charlotte Cooper Parris. (lmb)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2953 (SRN/HB). (lmb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.. (Miller, Craig)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7291893) filed by Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-M, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc. v. All These Things, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Mitchell
Represented By: Rachel Zaiger
Represented By: J Michael Dady
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anitra Mitchell
Represented By: Rachel Zaiger
Represented By: J Michael Dady
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All These Things, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Zaiger
Represented By: J Michael Dady
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Cooper Parris
Represented By: Rachel Zaiger
Represented By: J Michael Dady
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace And Love, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Zaiger
Represented By: J Michael Dady
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCP, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Zaiger
Represented By: J Michael Dady
Represented By: Kristy Lynn Miamen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mainstream Fashions Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: Craig P Miller
Represented By: Maisa Jean Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?