Krueger v. Gerdau Ameristeel US Inc.
Plaintiff: Jacob Krueger
Defendant: Gerdau Ameristeel US Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02978
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 10/30/2020. Expert Discovery due by 3/19/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 11/13/2020. Motions (disp) due by 5/19/2021. Ready for trial due by 8/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/22/2020. (TMA)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: The pretrial conference is CANCELLED. Magistrate Judge Wright will issue the Pretrial Scheduling Order on the papers. Counsel are directed to review the order carefully. (TMA)
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The Rule 16 Pretrial Conference scheduled for January 21, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Wright will be telephonic. Counsel were provided conference bridge instructions via email.(TMA)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/15/2020. (TMA)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Goerke, Grant)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Gerdau Ameristeel US Inc.. Jointly Signed by Jacob Krueger. (Goerke, Grant)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Gerdau Ameristeel US Inc.. Jointly Signed by Jacob Krueger.(Goerke, Grant)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Gerdau, S.A. (Brazil) is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Gerdau Ameristeel US Inc.. (Goerke, Grant)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/14/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2978 JRT/ECW. (kt)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Jamie Schmidt re #1 Notice of Removal, by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc. . (Goerke, Grant)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goerke, Grant)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number ?? (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7298184) filed by Gerdau Ameristeel U.S. Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service) (Goerke, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krueger v. Gerdau Ameristeel US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerdau Ameristeel US Inc.
Represented By: Grant Daniel Goerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Krueger
Represented By: Ryan H Ahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?