Edwards v. U.S Dist Court
Petitioner: Johnathan Bernard Edwards
Respondent: U.S Dist Court and William Bolin
Case Number: 0:2019cv02984
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - 1. Respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Petitioner Johnathan Bernard Edwards, showing cause why the writ should not be granted. 2. Respondent's answer must fully comply with the requirements of Rules 5(b), (c) and (d) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts and must include a reasoned memorandum of law and fact fully stating Respondent's legal position on Edwards' claims. The answer must be filed with the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, and a copy of the answer must be served upon Edwards simultaneously with such filing. 3. If Edwards intends to file a reply to the answer, he must do so within thirty (30) days of the date when Respondents answer is filed. Thereafter, no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as expressly authorized by Court Order. 4. Edwards' Motion to Vacate Sentence, #3 , is DENIED without prejudice as duplicative of the habeas corpus petition itself. 5. The Clerk of Court's office is directed to substitute William Bolin as Respondent in the present action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/30/2019. (JLB)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R Marker on behalf of U.S Dist Court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Marker, Peter)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by U.S Dist Court Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION VACATE SENTENCE OR IN ALETNATIVE REVERSE AND REMAND SO THAT PETITIONER COULD RECEIVE A FIAR TRIAL, OR CORRECT PETITIONERS SENTENCE filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards.(JGK) Document QC'd on 12/18/2019 (JGK).
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION VACATE SENTENCE OR IN ALETNATIVE REVERSE AND REMAND SO THAT PETITIONER COULD RECEIVE A FAIR TRIAL, OR CORRECT PETITIONERS SENTENCE. filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards. (JGK)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL PRO SE BRIEF filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JGK) Document QC'd on 12/18/2019 (JGK).
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 4-105472) filed by Johnathan Bernard Edwards. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ntc Appeal, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/18/2019 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. U.S Dist Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S Dist Court
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Bolin
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Peter R Marker
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnathan Bernard Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?