De La Fuente v. Simon
Plaintiff: Roque De La Fuente
Defendant: Steve Simon
Case Number: 0:2019cv02995
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #8 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Hartshorn, Nathan)
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Bibi Black in SUPPORT OF #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steve Simon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4)(Hartshorn, Nathan)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steve Simon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hartshorn, Nathan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Hartshorn, Nathan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steve Simon. (Hartshorn, Nathan)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/10/2019. (CLB)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul A Rossi for Roque De La Fuente. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/9/2019. (NAH)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roque De La Fuente. Steve Simon served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Kaardal, Erick)
November 29, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Steve Simon. (kt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2995 DSD/HB. (kt)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul A. Rossi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7301653 filed by Roque De La Fuente. (Kaardal, Erick)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Steve Simon (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7301562) filed by Roque De La Fuente. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaardal, Erick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Fuente v. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roque De La Fuente
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: Paul A Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Simon
Represented By: Nathan J Hartshorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?