Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc. et al v. Holiday Diversified Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: East Grand Station, Inc. and Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc.
Defendant: Holiday Diversified Services, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 0:2019cv03106
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
2 Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:2801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Holiday Diversified Services, LLC Notice of Name & Email Change (Rotchadl, Nick)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER on #26 Stipulation. The briefing and hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Enjoin the Nonrenewal of a Petroleum Marketing Franchise Under the Petroleum Marketing Practices act, 15 U.S.C., 2801, et seq. is stayed through March 6, 2020. The Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is March 6, 2020. The parties will file a status report with the Court by March 4, 2020, in which they may request a briefing schedule and hearing date on the Motion if they are unable to resolve this matter by then. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 2/3/2020. (KMW)
January 31, 2020 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #26 Stipulation. (Rotchadl, Nick)
January 31, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION by Holiday Diversified Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc., East Grand Station, Inc., and Holiday Diversified Services, LLC. (Rotchadl, Nick)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER on #23 Stipulation. The Motion Hearing Scheduled for 1/9/20 is cancelled. The Briefing for the TRO/Preliminary Injunction Motion is stayed. Parties shall continue settlement negotiations. An update shall be filed with the Court on or before January 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 1/2/2020. (KMW)
January 2, 2020 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #23 Stipulation,,. (Rotchadl, Nick)
January 2, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin the Nonrenewal of a Petroleum Marketing Franchise Under the Petroleum Marketing Practices Act, 15 U.S.C. 2801, et seq. - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested by Holiday Diversified Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc., East Grand Station, Inc., and Holiday Diversified Services, LLC. (Rotchadl, Nick)
December 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin the Nonrenewal of a Petroleum Marketing Franchise Under the Petroleum Marketing Practices Act, 15 U.S.C. 2801, et seq. - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : The Motion Hearing has been scheduled for January 9, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Nancy E. Brasel in Courtroom 3A of the St. Paul Federal Courthouse. Opposition to the motion is due 1/3/20 and reply is due 1/7/20. (KMW)
December 27, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Status Conference held on 12/27/2019. A hearing date and briefing schedule was determined for the Motion for TRO #10 . Notice to follow. (KMW)
December 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Nick R Rotchadl on behalf of Holiday Diversified Services, LLC. (Rotchadl, Nick)
December 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry L Bundy on behalf of Holiday Diversified Services, LLC. (Bundy, Kerry)
December 26, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY-NOTICE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. A status conference is scheduled for December 27, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. by phone. Conference Bridge Instructions will be provided to the parties prior to the conference. (KMW) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (MMG).
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by East Grand Station, Inc., Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc. re #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin the Nonrenewal of a Petroleum Marketing Franchise Under the Petroleum Marketing Practices Act, 15 U.S.C. 2801, et seq. - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, #14 Proposed Order to Judge, #13 Declaration in Support,, #11 Notice of Hearing on Motion, (Merrill, Courtland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc., East Grand Station, Inc.. Holiday Diversified Services, LLC served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William R Paterson on behalf of East Grand Station, Inc., Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc.. (Paterson, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin the Nonrenewal of a Petroleum Marketing Franchise Under the Petroleum Marketing Practices Act, 15 U.S.C. 2801, et seq. - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by East Grand Station, Inc., Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc..(Merrill, Courtland)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Kory Knoff in Support of #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin the Nonrenewal of a Petroleum Marketing Franchise Under the Petroleum Marketing Practices Act, 15 U.S.C. 2801, et seq. - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by East Grand Station, Inc., Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Merrill, Courtland)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin the Nonrenewal of a Petroleum Marketing Franchise Under the Petroleum Marketing Practices Act, 15 U.S.C. 2801, et seq. - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by East Grand Station, Inc., Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin the Nonrenewal of a Petroleum Marketing Franchise Under the Petroleum Marketing Practices Act, 15 U.S.C. 2801, et seq. - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Merrill, Courtland)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin the Nonrenewal of a Petroleum Marketing Franchise Under the Petroleum Marketing Practices Act, 15 U.S.C. 2801, et seq. - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by East Grand Station, Inc., Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc.. (Merrill, Courtland)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL AND DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Judge Paul A. Magnuson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-3106 NEB/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 12/19/2019. (CLK)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas Bleau for East Grand Station, Inc. and for Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Megan Ann Childress for East Grand Station, Inc. and for Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/19/2019. (NAH)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan Childress. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7348651 filed by East Grand Station, Inc., Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc.. (Merrill, Courtland)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas P. Bleau. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7348630 filed by East Grand Station, Inc., Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc.. (Merrill, Courtland)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Thomas P. Bleau, Megan Childress as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Does, Holiday Diversified Services, LLC. (lmb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-3106 (PAM/LIB). (lmb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff East Grand Station. (Merrill, Courtland)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holiday Diversified Services, LLC, Does (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7345416) filed by Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc., East Grand Station, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc. et al v. Holiday Diversified Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Grand Station, Inc.
Represented By: Courtland C Merrill
Represented By: William R Paterson
Represented By: Megan Ann Childress
Represented By: Thomas Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kory Knoff Convenience Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Courtland C Merrill
Represented By: William R Paterson
Represented By: Megan Ann Childress
Represented By: Thomas Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Diversified Services, LLC
Represented By: Nick R Rotchadl
Represented By: Kerry L Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?