Markham v. Janssen
Petitioner: Oji Konata Markham
Respondent: Vicki Janssen
Case Number: 0:2019cv03110
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vicki Janssen re #14 Brief, #15 Exhibit, #13 Response to Habeas Petition (Pipenhagen, Heather)
February 13, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT List re #14 Brief filed by Vicki Janssen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-1 - A-535, #2 Exhibit(s) A-536 - A-994)(Pipenhagen, Heather)
February 13, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #13 Response to Habeas Petition . (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pipenhagen, Heather)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Vicki Janssen. (Pipenhagen, Heather)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Discovery; denying #9 Motion for Discovery; granting #11 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) to file answer within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/15/2020. (MSK)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Oji Konata Markham. (MKB) Document QC'd 1/14/2020 (ACH).
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Discovery with Word Count Compliance Certificate filed by Oji Konata Markham.(MKB) Document QC'd 1/14/2020 (ACH).
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION for Discovery filed by Oji Konata Markham. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MKB) Document QC'd 1/14/2020 (ACH).
January 2, 2020 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vicki Janssen re #7 Notice of Appearance (Pipenhagen, Heather)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Dawn Pipenhagen on behalf of Vicki Janssen. (Pipenhagen, Heather)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Vicki Janssen Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney substitution)(Frank, Matthew)
December 20, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office re: 2254 no Fee/IFP as to Oji Konata Markham. (JGK)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Oji Konata Markham. (JGK)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Discovery filed by Oji Konata Markham. (JGK)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Oji Konata Markham.(JGK)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Oji Konata Markham. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markham v. Janssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vicki Janssen
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Heather Dawn Pipenhagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oji Konata Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?