Tomelleri v. Cascade Hospitality, LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri and Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: Cascade Hospitality, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv03117
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Cascade Hospitality, LLC. (JME)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Cascade Hospitality, LLC. (Maguire, Oliver)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Oliver Peter Maguire for Joseph R. Tomelleri. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/8/2020. (JGK)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Oliver P. Maguire. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7382054 filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Stowman, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Oliver P. Maguire as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (5th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-3117 DWF/LIB. (CLK)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). cc: Copyright Office. (Stowman, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (CLK).
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7349262) filed by Joseph R Tomelleri. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Tomelleri-Civil Cover Sheet) (Stowman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Cascade Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Stowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: Oliver Peter Maguire
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Stowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?