United States of America v. Logan
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Anthony Logan
Case Number: 0:2019cv03124
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:4246
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/23/2020. (MSK)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL - It is hereby Ordered that James Ostgard is appointed counsel as to Anthony Logan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/3/2020. (KNK)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/3/2020. (MSK)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. SEALING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/3/2020. (MSK)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Letter to Magistrate Judge. (Marentette, Pamela)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Letter to Magistrate Judge. (Marentette, Pamela)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by United States of America . (Marentette, Pamela)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-3124 (DSD/BRT). (KNK)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Petition (in a Civil Case), #3 Statement instead of Redacted Document, #2 Sealed Document (Marentette, Pamela)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #2 Sealed Document(s) - Exhibit D . (Marentette, Pamela)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED Exhibit D re #1 Petition (in a Civil Case), by United States of America. (Marentette, Pamela)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITIONTO DETERMINE PRESENT MENTAL CONDITION OF AN IMPRISONED PERSON against Anthony Logan filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Marentette, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Logan
Represented By: James E Ostgard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Pamela Marentette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?