Ankarlo v. Wisconsin Central Limited
Plaintiff: Steve J. Ankarlo
Defendant: Steve J Ankarlo, Wisconsin Central Limited and Canadian National Railway
Case Number: 0:2019cv03166
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MMP)
February 17, 2020 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Grand Trunk Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Wisconsin Central Limited. (Holman, Eric)
February 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric E Holman on behalf of Wisconsin Central Limited. (Holman, Eric)
February 17, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Jury Demand filed by Wisconsin Central Limited. (Holman, Eric)
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve J. Ankarlo. Wisconsin Central Limited served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Bremseth, Fredric) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (CLK).
January 27, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Reissued as to Wisconsin Central Limited a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a Canadian National Railway Company. (MKB)
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Central Limited. (CLK)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wisconsin Central Ltd., a Delaware corporation, d/b/a Canadian National Railway Company, a foreign corporation. filed by Steve J. Ankarlo. Filer requests summons issued. (Bremseth, Fredric)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve J. Ankarlo. Wisconsin Central Ltd., a Delaware corporation, d/b/a Canadian National Railway Company, a foreign corporation served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Bremseth, Fredric)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David L Blunt for Steve J. Ankarlo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/9/2020. (NAH)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Re-issued as to Canadian National Railway d/b/a Wisconsin Central LTD. (lmb)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Canadian National Railway (dba Wisconsin Central Ltd.). (CLK)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Wisconsin Central Ltd. Steve J. Ankarlo. (Bremseth, Fredric)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David L. Blunt. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7381139 filed by Steve J. Ankarlo. (Bremseth, Fredric) Modified text on 1/9/2020 (NAH).
December 30, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve J. Ankarlo. Canadian National Railway served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Bremseth, Fredric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David L. Blunt as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MTP)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Canadian National Railway. (MTP)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-3166 DWF/LIB. (MTP)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Canadian National Railway (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7359865) filed by Steve J Ankarlo. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bremseth, Fredric) Modified text on 12/27/2019 (MTP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ankarlo v. Wisconsin Central Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve J Ankarlo
Represented By: Fredric A Bremseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Limited
Represented By: Eric E Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian National Railway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve J. Ankarlo
Represented By: David L Blunt
Represented By: Fredric A Bremseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?