Hodges v. State of Minnesota Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: David Laurence Hodges
Defendant: Centurion of Minnesota, L.L.C., Jeffrey T. Titus, James M. Olson, John Doe, Jane Roe, Cathy Nielsen, Nanette M. Larson, Stacy R. Olson, Derek L. Gunderson, Ashlee E. Berts, Darryl Quiram and State of Minnesota Department of Corrections
Case Number: 0:2020cv00090
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by David Laurence Hodges. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kushner, Jordan)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/1/2020. Expert Discovery due by 1/21/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 12/15/2020. Motions (disp) due by 2/15/2021. Ready for trial due by 6/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/19/2020. (KAT)
February 14, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Centurion of Minnesota, L.L.C., Darryl Quiram.(Novak, Anthony)
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 Redacted Document for #14 Sealed Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Centurion of Minnesota, L.L.C., Darryl Quiram. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Novak, Anthony)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Defendants Centurion of Minnesota, LLC and Darryl Quiram, MD. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Novak, Anthony)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/14/2020. (KAT)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/13/2020. Scheduling Order to be issued. (KAT)
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Novak, Anthony)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT Joint Rule 26(f) by Ashlee E. Berts, Derek L. Gunderson, Nanette M. Larson, Cathy Nielsen, James M. Olson, Stacy R. Olson, State of Minnesota Department of Corrections, Jeffrey T. Titus. (Weiner, Joseph)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #7 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Centurion of Minnesota, L.L.C., Darryl Quiram.(Novak, Anthony)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Novak, Anthony)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Centurion of Minnesota, L.L.C., Darryl Quiram. (Novak, Anthony)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. Request by counsel to appear by telephone has been GRANTED for the Pretrial Conference on 2/13/2020 at 9:00 AM. Call-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel. (KAT)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
January 8, 2020 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Centurion of Minnesota, L.L.C., Darryl Quiram Consent for Removal (Novak, Anthony)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ashlee E. Berts, Derek L. Gunderson, Nanette M. Larson, Cathy Nielsen, James M. Olson, Stacy R. Olson, State of Minnesota Department of Corrections, Jeffrey T. Titus. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Weiner, Joseph)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-90 (WMW/KMM). (MKB)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-cv-19-8342 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7382402) filed by Darryl Quiram, MD, Centurion of Minnesota, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Novak, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges v. State of Minnesota Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Minnesota, L.L.C.
Represented By: Monica Detert
Represented By: Anthony J Novak
Represented By: Mark A Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey T. Titus
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Olson
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Nielsen
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanette M. Larson
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy R. Olson
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek L. Gunderson
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashlee E. Berts
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Quiram
Represented By: Monica Detert
Represented By: Anthony J Novak
Represented By: Mark A Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota Department of Corrections
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Laurence Hodges
Represented By: Jordan S Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?