Seward et al v. Midwest Communication Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Isaac Messner and Jimmy Seward
Defendant: Midwest Communication Services, Inc. and Dish Network Service, L.L.C.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00093
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Midwest Communication Services, Inc.. (Rengel, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Rengel on behalf of Midwest Communication Services, Inc.. (Rengel, Michael)
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Isaac Messner, Jimmy Seward of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fisher, Michele)
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Isaac Messner, Jimmy Seward. (Fisher, Michele)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(BJP)
February 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Isaac Messner, Jimmy Seward of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fisher, Michele)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Dish Network Service, L.L.C.. (Laurent, David)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christian Charles Antkowiak for Dish Network Service, L.L.C.; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David Joseph Laurent for Dish Network Service, L.L.C. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/29/2020. (NAH)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text-Only) ORDER on #7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Dish Network Service, L.L.C. answer due 2/14/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/29/2020. (KAT)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation,. (O'Connor, Timothy)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT DISH NETWORK SERVICE L.L.C. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Dish Network Service, L.L.C.. Jointly Signed by Jimmy Seward and Isaac Mesner, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (O'Connor, Timothy)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David J. Laurent. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7434687 filed by Dish Network Service, L.L.C.. (O'Connor, Timothy)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christian Antkowiak. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7433294 filed by Dish Network Service, L.L.C.. (O'Connor, Timothy)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Isaac Messner, Jimmy Seward. Dish Network Service, L.L.C. served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (Fisher, Michele)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dish Network Service, L.L.C., Midwest Communication Services, Inc. (CLK)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-93 JRT/KMM. (CLK)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dish Network Service, L.L.C., Midwest Communication Services, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7382964) filed by Isaac Messner, Jimmy Seward. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A- Plaintiff Consent Forms, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fisher, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seward et al v. Midwest Communication Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Messner
Represented By: Jay E Eidsness
Represented By: Michele R Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Seward
Represented By: Jay E Eidsness
Represented By: Michele R Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Communication Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T Rengel
Represented By: Ryan Fullerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network Service, L.L.C.
Represented By: David Joseph Laurent
Represented By: Timothy J O'Connor
Represented By: Christian Charles Antkowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?