Walton v. Blue Earth County et al
Plaintiff: Tierre Theo Walton
Defendant: Blue Earth County and Bradley Peterson
Case Number: 0:2020cv00165
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #1 resent to Tierre Theo Walton at updated address. (kt)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT: Scheduling Order Recommendations due by 3/27/2020. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/28/2020. (BJP)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tierre Theo Walton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Qc'd on 3/5/2020 (KNK).
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Blue Earth County, Bradley Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hiveley, Jason)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tierre Theo Walton. Blue Earth County served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020; Bradley Peterson served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 3/4/2020 (JGK).
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blue Earth County, Bradley Peterson. cc: Walton with Service Information Sheet. (JGK) Modified text on 1/13/2020 (JGK). Modified text on 1/14/2020 (JGK).
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 FILED IN ERROR - Summons Issued as to Blue Earth County, Bradley Peterson. (NAH) Modified text on 1/13/2020 (JGK).
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Blue Earth County, Bradley Peterson (filing fee $400, receipt number 34641015838) filed by Tierre Theo Walton. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. Blue Earth County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tierre Theo Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Earth County
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Peterson
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?