Walker v. FMC Rochester et al
Plaintiff: Barry L. Walker
Defendant: FMC Rochester, John & Jane Does # 1-10, Machutt, Kepp and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 0:2020cv00247
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to FMC Rochester, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Kepp, Machutt. (CLK)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Barry L. Walker in response to #9 . cc: Walker with USM forms. (CLK)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER to Clerk's Office Requesting Service Forms filed by Barry L. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due as to enclosing cc: Prison Authorities, FMC Rochester (MTP)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete. (MTP) cc: Walker Modified text on 3/2/2020 (MTP).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs.(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/27/2020.(JGS)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 Prison Trust Statement by Barry L. Walker (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 3/4/2020 (JGK).
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion to Correct Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/30/2020. (MSK)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO CORRECT THE RECORD filed by Barry L. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 2/6/2020 (JGK).
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Barry L. Walker. (JGK) Document QC'd on 1/23/2020 (JGK).
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FMC Rochester, Federal Bureau of Prisons, John & Jane Does # 1-10, Kepp, Machutt filed by Barry L. Walker. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 1/23/2020 (JGK). Modified text on 2/11/2020 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. FMC Rochester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does # 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?