Braun v. Walz et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Christopher Braun
Defendant: Chris Pawelk, Commission of Corrections, Tim Walz, Sherlinda Wheeler, Lt. Jason R. Hills, Byron Matthews, S. Henry, Nancy Leseman and Nate Knutson
Case Number: 0:2020cv00333
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER TO COURT from Nathan C. Braun. (Attachments: #1 Kite Form, #2 Envelope)(CLK)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due as to enclosing re #5 Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail cc: Prison Authorities, MCF-Rush City (KNK)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER in Response to #4 Letter. (Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/20/2020. (JGS)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER TO THE COURT from Nathan C. Braun. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER deferring ruling on #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs and directing Plaintiff to submit financial information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/28/2020. (JGS)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (JGK) Qc'd on 1/27/2020 (KNK).
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Commission of Corrections, S. Henry, Jason R. Hills, Nate Knutson, Nancy Leseman, Byron Matthews, Chris Pawelk, Tim Walz, Sherlinda Wheeler filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) Qc'd on 1/27/2020 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun v. Walz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Pawelk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commission of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherlinda Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Jason R. Hills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Leseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Christopher Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?