Armendariz v. Rovney
Plaintiff: Joshua Raymon Armendariz and Joshua Raymond Armendariz
Defendant: Chris Rovney
Case Number: 0:2020cv00464
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION REQUESTING INFORMATION filed by Joshua Raymond Armendariz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK).
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 RECEIPT number 44641106610 in the amount of $400.00 issued to Joshua Raymond Armendariz. (MMG) Qc'd on 3/5/2020 (KNK).
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER/REQUEST re: copy request and correct spelling of middle name from Joshua Raymond Armendariz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2020: #2 attachment) (KNK). Document QC'd on 2/28/2020 (JGK).
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Re:More Discovery by Joshua Raymon Armendariz (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Envelope, #5 Envelope)(MMG) Qc'd on 3/5/2020 (KNK).
February 11, 2020 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER regarding payment of initial partial filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/10/2020. (JMK)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Raymon Armendariz (JGK) Doc. QC'd on 2/19/2020 (LPH).
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joshua Raymon Armendariz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JGK) Doc. QC'd on 2/19/2020 (LPH).
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joshua Raymon Armendariz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2019 Year to Date Wages, #2 Exhibit(s) A-B)(JGK) Doc. QC'd on 2/19/2020 (LPH).
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Chris Rovney filed by Joshua Raymon Armendariz. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) List and Key Information, #2 Exhibit(s) A-N, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (JGK) Doc. QC'd on 2/19/2020 (LPH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armendariz v. Rovney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Rovney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Raymon Armendariz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Raymond Armendariz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?