Terrell v. Saul
Plaintiff: DeAnna Terrell
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv00576
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until and including May 8, 2020 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/14/2020. (TMA)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER REQUESTING AN EXTENSION FOR FILING AN ADDENDUM TO THE COMPLAINT filed by DeAnna Terrell. (MTP) Modified text on 3/16/2020 (CLK). Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK).
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (TMA)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: 1.Plaintiff DeAnna T. must filewithin 30 days of this Orders datean amended complaint that complies with the discussion above.2.If DeAnna T. does not file an amended complaint complying with those conditions within 30 days of this Orders date, the Court will recommend this actions dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/25/2020. (TMA)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by DeAnna Terrell. (MTP) Document QC'd on 3/4/2020 (JGK).
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by DeAnna Terrell. Case assigned to Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright per (MJ all - Social Security Appeals) list. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MTP) Document QC'd on 3/4/2020 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAnna Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?