Lucas v. Sportradar, US et al
Plaintiff: Cody Lucas
Defendant: Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, Major League Baseball and Sportradar, US
Case Number: 0:2020cv00602
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
2 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin Walker for MLB Advanced Media, LP and for Major League Baseball; granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Hannah Lonky Fackler for MLB Advanced Media, LP and for Major League Baseball; granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Louis Hardiman for MLB Advanced Media, LP and for Major League Baseball; granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tyler Mathew Dato for MLB Advanced Media, LP and for Major League Baseball. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/3/2020. (NAH)
April 1, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tyler M. Dato. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7610184 filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Van Oort, Aaron)
April 1, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John L. Hardiman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7610176 filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Van Oort, Aaron)
April 1, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hannah L. Fackler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7610162 filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Van Oort, Aaron)
April 1, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin R. Walker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7610127 filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Van Oort, Aaron)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER on #21 Stipulation. Sportradar US LLC has until May 8, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/31/2020. (HAM)
March 26, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 Stipulation. (Sharma, Aalok)
March 26, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Sportradar, US. Jointly Signed by Cody Lucas. (Sharma, Aalok)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susan Richard Nelson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-602 PJS/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/25/2020. (KDS)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Nancy E. Brasel recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-602 SRN/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 3/25/2020. (KDS)
March 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Aalok Kumar Sharma on behalf of Sportradar, US. (Sharma, Aalok)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Hilary Preston for Houston Astros, LLC; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael T. Reynolds for Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lauren A. Moskowitz for Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Katherine Forrest for Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/19/2020. (NAH)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine B. Forrest. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7562175 filed by Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP. (Van Oort, Aaron)
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren A. Moskowitz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7562133 filed by Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP. (Van Oort, Aaron)
March 13, 2020 Filing 14 FILED IN ERROR/WILL BE RE-FILED. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristen A. Moskowitz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7562075 filed by Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP. (Van Oort, Aaron) Modified text on 3/13/2020 (KDS).
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael T. Reynolds. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7562044 filed by Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP. (Van Oort, Aaron)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text-Only) ORDER on #11 Stipulation. Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP answer due 5/8/2020; Houston Astros, LLC answer due 5/8/2020; MLB Advanced Media, LP answer due 5/8/2020; Major League Baseball answer due 5/8/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/12/2020. (HAM)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. Jointly Signed by Cody Lucas, Major League Baseball, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, and Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP. (Van Oort, Aaron)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hilary L. Preston. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7555771 filed by Houston Astros, LLC. (Van Oort, Aaron)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rory Collins on behalf of Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Collins, Rory)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D Van Oort on behalf of Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Van Oort, Aaron)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul Geske for Cody Lucas. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/4/2020. (NAH)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul T. Geske. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7524348 filed by Cody Lucas. (Shelquist, Robert)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Eric C. Tostrud recused. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-602 NEB/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/27/2020. (KDS)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Myles McGuire; Paul T. Geske; Eugene Y. Turin; Timothy P. Kingsbury as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball, Sportradar, US. (lmb)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-602 (ECT/TNL). (lmb)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball, Sportradar, US (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7511518) filed by Cody Lucas. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shelquist, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. Sportradar, US et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP
Represented By: Lauren A. Moskowitz
Represented By: Katherine Forrest
Represented By: Michael T. Reynolds
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Represented By: Rory Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLB Advanced Media, LP
Represented By: Benjamin Walker
Represented By: Tyler Mathew Dato
Represented By: John Louis Hardiman
Represented By: Hannah Lonky Fackler
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Represented By: Rory Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Astros, LLC
Represented By: Hilary Preston
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Represented By: Rory Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major League Baseball
Represented By: Benjamin Walker
Represented By: Tyler Mathew Dato
Represented By: John Louis Hardiman
Represented By: Hannah Lonky Fackler
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Represented By: Rory Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportradar, US
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Represented By: Aalok Kumar Sharma
Represented By: Calvin P Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Lucas
Represented By: Robert K Shelquist
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Represented By: Paul Geske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?