Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Defendant: Wild Cat Ranch LLC, Gregory Hjelle, Providence Twin Cities LLC, Ryan Gilbertson, Christopher Johnson, Heidi Hjelle, Capital Investments 3020 LLC, Providence Management Company, LLC, Emily Johnson, Providence Investments, LLC, R.L. Johnson Numismatics, Inc., Providence Development, LLC, JRS Real Estate Partners LLC and Chetek Express, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00623
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER on #53 Stipulation. Ryan Gilbertson answer due 5/8/2020; Wild Cat Ranch LLC answer due 5/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/24/2020.(TJB)
April 22, 2020 Filing 54 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #53 Stipulation. (Richie, Joseph)
April 22, 2020 Filing 53 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Ryan Gilbertson, Wild Cat Ranch LLC. Jointly Signed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Richie, Joseph)
April 20, 2020 Filing 52 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing. Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz is CANCELLED. The document filed directing a pretrial conference was filed in the incorrect case. A correct order for pretrial will be filed when all answers have been docketed. (TJB)
April 17, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Emily Johnson. (Doerr, Sarah)
April 17, 2020 Filing 50 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Capital Investments 3020 LLC. (Kelly, Daniel)
April 17, 2020 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Chetek Express, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel)
April 17, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Capital Investments 3020 LLC, Chetek Express, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER on #44 Stipulation. Wild Cat Ranch LLC answer due 04/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/31/2020. (TJB)
March 27, 2020 Filing 45 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #44 Stipulation. (Richie, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Respond by Wild Cat Ranch LLC. Jointly Signed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Richie, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Filing 43 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Wild Cat Ranch LLC. (Richie, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Robert Richie on behalf of Wild Cat Ranch LLC. (Richie, Joseph)
March 27, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W Anthony on behalf of Wild Cat Ranch LLC. (Anthony, Joseph)
March 26, 2020 Filing 40 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant R.L. Johnson Numismatics, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 39 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Providence Twin Cities LLC. (Kelly, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 38 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Providence Management Company, LLC. (Kelly, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 37 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Providence Investments, LLC. (Kelly, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 36 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Providence Development, LLC. (Kelly, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant JRS Real Estate Partners LLC. (Kelly, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Gregory Hjelle, Heidi Hjelle, JRS Real Estate Partners LLC, Christopher Johnson, Providence Development, LLC, Providence Investments, LLC, Providence Management Company, LLC, Providence Twin Cities LLC, R.L. Johnson Numismatics, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Kelly on behalf of Gregory Hjelle, Heidi Hjelle, JRS Real Estate Partners LLC, Christopher Johnson, Providence Development, LLC, Providence Investments, LLC, Providence Management Company, LLC, Providence Twin Cities LLC, R.L. Johnson Numismatics, Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER on #30 Stipulation. Ryan Gilbertson answer due 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/25/2020. (TJB)
March 24, 2020 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #30 Stipulation. (Richie, Joseph)
March 24, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Respond by Ryan Gilbertson. Jointly Signed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Richie, Joseph)
March 24, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W Anthony on behalf of Ryan Gilbertson. (Anthony, Joseph)
March 24, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Robert Richie on behalf of Ryan Gilbertson. (Richie, Joseph)
March 13, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Providence Twin Cities LLC served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 26 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC as to JRS Real Estate Partners LLC. (Robbins, David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 25 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC as to Chetek Express, Inc.. (Robbins, David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Chetek Express, Inc. served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. JRS Real Estate Partners LLC served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 11, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Capital Investments 3020 LLC served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 11, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. R.L. Johnson Numismatics, Inc. served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 11, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Providence Investments, LLC served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Robbins, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Ryan Gilbertson served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC as to R.L. Johnson Numismatics, Inc.. (Robbins, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC as to Capital Investments 3020 LLC. (Robbins, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC as to Providence Investments, LLC. (Robbins, David)
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Providence Development, LLC served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Wild Cat Ranch LLC served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Christopher Johnson served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Emily Johnson served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Gregory Hjelle served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Providence Management Company, LLC served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Heidi Hjelle served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Robbins, David)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty for all further proceedings. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-623 DSD/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 3/2/2020. (kt)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Capital Investments 3020 LLC, JRS Real Estate Partners LLC, Providence Twin Cities LLC, Wild Cat Ranch LLC. (CLK)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Chetek Express, Inc., Ryan Gilbertson, Gregory Hjelle, Heidi Hjelle, Christopher Johnson, Emily Johnson, Providence Development, LLC, Providence Investments, LLC, Providence Management Company, LLC, R.L. Johnson Numismatics, Inc. (CLK)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-623 WMW/DTS. (CLK)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Morgan Stanley is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Robbins, David)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Robbins on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Robbins, David)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7518467) filed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Robbins, David) Modified text on 3/4/2020 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild Cat Ranch LLC
Represented By: Joseph Robert Richie
Represented By: Joseph W Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Hjelle
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Twin Cities LLC
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Gilbertson
Represented By: Joseph Robert Richie
Represented By: Joseph W Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Hjelle
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Investments 3020 LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Johnson
Represented By: Sarah E Doerr
Represented By: Bryant D Tchida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Investments, LLC
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. Johnson Numismatics, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Development, LLC
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRS Real Estate Partners LLC
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chetek Express, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: David Robbins
Represented By: Stephen M Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?