Graham v. Nelson et al
Plaintiff: William Charles Graham
Defendant: Andrew H. Mohring, Erica H. MacDonald, Justin A. Wesley, Amber M. Brennan, Katherine M. Menendez and Susan R. Nelson
Case Number: 0:2020cv00646
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 Correspondence filed by William Charles Graham. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(lmb) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (JME). DOCUMENT QC'd by LJG on 3/25/2020.
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SUMMARILY DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Stephen R Bough on 3/11/2020. (TLD) Copy of this order mailed to: William Charles Graham, Sherburne County Jail, 13880 Business Center Drive NW, Elk River, MN 55330-1692
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN CIRCUIT. Case reassigned to Judge Stephen R Bough for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-646 (SRB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Lavenski R. Smith, Chief Judge, Eighth Circuit, United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, on 3/6/2020. (lmb)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. It is hereby determined that all U.S. District Judges and U.S. Magistrate Judges of the Court are disqualified from presiding over this matter. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/4/2020. (lmb)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Charles Graham re #1 Prisoner Complaint, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by William Charles Graham (NAH)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by William Charles Graham. (NAH)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Amber M. Brennan, Erica H. MacDonald, Katherine M. Menendez, Andrew H. Mohring, Susan R. Nelson, Justin A. Wesley filed by William Charles Graham. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Nelson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew H. Mohring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica H. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin A. Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber M. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine M. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Charles Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?