A. Zahner Company v. PCL Construction Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A. Zahner Company
Defendant: PCL Construction Services, Inc. and M.G. McGrath, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00689
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Todd Gangel for A. Zahner Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/17/2020. (NAH)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott Brown for A. Zahner Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/16/2020. (NAH)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Todd A. Gangel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7550510 filed by A. Zahner Company. (Fermoyle, Kelly)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott R. Brown. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7547956 filed by A. Zahner Company. (Fermoyle, Kelly)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Fermoyle, Kelly)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to M.G. McGrath, Inc., PCL Construction Services, Inc.. (MMG)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Scott R. Brown, Todd A. Gangel as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMG)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-689 SRN/TNL. (MMG)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff A. Zahner Company. (Fermoyle, Kelly)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against M.G. McGrath, Inc., PCL Construction Services, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7544116) filed by A. Zahner Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fermoyle, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A. Zahner Company v. PCL Construction Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCL Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.G. McGrath, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Zahner Company
Represented By: Kelly J. Fermoyle
Represented By: Todd Gangel
Represented By: Scott Brown
Represented By: Randall E Kahnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?