Corning Incorporated v. Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Corning Incorporated
Defendant: Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation and John R. Wilson
Case Number: 0:2020cv00700
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
2 Judge: Katherine M Menendez
3 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Partial Motion to Dismiss the Complaint) MOTION to Stay Deadline for Answering the Complaint filed by John R. Wilson, Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation.(Robbennolt, Paul)
May 7, 2020 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #20 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion to Stay filed by John R. Wilson, Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation.(Robbennolt, Paul)
May 7, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of Paul J. Robbennolt in Support of #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Partial Motion to Dismiss the Complaint) MOTION to Stay Deadline for Answering the Complaint filed by John R. Wilson, Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 (U.S. Patent No. 8,809,044), #2 Exhibit(s) 2 (MPEP Section 1302.08))(Robbennolt, Paul)
May 7, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Partial Motion to Dismiss the Complaint) MOTION to Stay Deadline for Answering the Complaint filed by John R. Wilson, Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Robbennolt, Paul)
May 7, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Partial Motion to Dismiss the Complaint) MOTION to Stay Deadline for Answering the Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Robbennolt, Paul)
May 7, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Partial Motion to Dismiss the Complaint), MOTION to Stay Deadline for Answering the Complaint filed by John R. Wilson, Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. (Robbennolt, Paul)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on #17 Stipulation. Defendants' answer due on or before May 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/28/2020.(JRE)
April 28, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Robbennolt, Paul)
April 28, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by John R. Wilson, Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. Jointly Signed by Corning Incorporated. (Robbennolt, Paul)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on #14 Stipulation. The period in which Defendants may answer,move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended by 30 days through and including April 30. 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/25/2020. (HAM)
March 25, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, [Stipulation to Extend Time] by John R. Wilson, Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. Jointly Signed by Corning Incorporated. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kimball R Anderson for Corning Incorporated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/18/2020. (NAH)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sharon Lin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7570149 filed by Corning Incorporated. (Daley, Annamarie) Modified text on 3/18/2020 (NAH).
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kimball Anderson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7569355 filed by Corning Incorporated. (Daley, Annamarie)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ivan Poullaos for Corning Incorporated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/16/2020. (NAH)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ivan Poullaos. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7562512 filed by Corning Incorporated. (Daley, Annamarie)
March 13, 2020 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corning Incorporated. John R. Wilson served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Daley, Annamarie)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corning Incorporated. Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Daley, Annamarie)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Corning Incorporated. (Daley, Annamarie)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-700 (DWF/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank and Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 3/11/2020. (MKB)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Daley, Annamarie)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John R. Wilson, Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. (MKB)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Patent) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-700 (WMW/KMM). (MKB)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief against John R. Wilson, Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7547842) filed by Corning Incorporated. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Daley, Annamarie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corning Incorporated v. Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation
Represented By: Paul J Robbennolt
Represented By: Michelle E Dawson
Represented By: Sri K Sankaran
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Britta S Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Wilson
Represented By: Paul J Robbennolt
Represented By: Michelle E Dawson
Represented By: Sri K Sankaran
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Britta S Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corning Incorporated
Represented By: Annamarie A Daley
Represented By: Ivan Poullaos
Represented By: Kimball R Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?