Doe v. Hegland-Smith et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Melissa Hegland-Smith and Project Pathfinder, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00703
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text-Only) ORDER on #20 Stipulation to Allow Extension re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General . Replies due by 6/9/2020. Responses due by 5/26/2020. Ordered by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/21/2020.(HAZ)
April 15, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 Stipulation. (Johnson, Keith)
April 15, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Allow Extension by John Doe. (Johnson, Keith)
April 8, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION Permission to Proceed Anonymously under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe.(Johnson, Keith)
April 8, 2020 Filing 18 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #14 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by John Doe.(Johnson, Keith)
April 8, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Keith D. Johnson in SUPPORT OF #14 MOTION Permission to Proceed Anonymously under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe.(Johnson, Keith)
April 8, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of John Doe in SUPPORT OF #14 MOTION Permission to Proceed Anonymously under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe.(Johnson, Keith)
April 8, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION Permission to Proceed Anonymously under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Keith)
April 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION Permission to Proceed Anonymously under a Pseudonym filed by John Doe. (Johnson, Keith)
April 7, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Melissa Hegland-Smith served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. Project Pathfinder, Inc. served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Johnson, Keith) Modified text on 4/7/2020 (MKB).
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Chief Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Chief Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. Replies due by 5/7/2020. Responses due by 4/23/2020. (HAZ)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Project Pathfinder, Inc..(Kjellberg-Nelson, Cally)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Project Pathfinder, Inc..(Kjellberg-Nelson, Cally)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Redacted Document for #8 SEALED - Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Project Pathfinder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kjellberg-Nelson, Cally)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Project Pathfinder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kjellberg-Nelson, Cally)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Kjellberg-Nelson, Cally)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Project Pathfinder, Inc.. (Kjellberg-Nelson, Cally)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cally R Kjellberg-Nelson on behalf of Project Pathfinder, Inc.. (Kjellberg-Nelson, Cally)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. John Doe served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Johnson, Keith)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Melissa Hegland-Smith, Project Pathfinder, Inc. (CLK)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-703 JRT/KMM. (CLK)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7551774) filed by John Doe. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Hegland-Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Hegland-Smith
Represented By: Cally R Kjellberg-Nelson
Represented By: Dyan J Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Pathfinder, Inc.
Represented By: Cally R Kjellberg-Nelson
Represented By: Dyan J Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Keith D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?