Handy Jones v. City of St. Paul, Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: Kim Diane Handy Jones
Defendant: Jordan Wild, Todd Axtell, Nathaniel Younce, City of St. Paul, Minnesota and Mikko Norman
Case Number: 0:2020cv00707
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/30/2020.(KAT)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Expert Discovery due by 8/20/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 4/30/2021. Motions (disp) due by 10/20/2021. Ready for trial due by 1/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/30/2020.(KAT)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephone Conference held on 4/28/2020. (LCC) Modified file date on 4/30/2020 (MMG).
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Todd Axtell, City of St. Paul, Minnesota, Mikko Norman, Jordan Wild, Nathaniel Younce. Jointly Signed by Kim Handy Jones.(Edwards, Anthony)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. The Pretrial Conference on 4/28/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Menendez will be held by TELEPHONE. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. (KAT)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-707 DSD/KMM. (CLK)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Todd Axtell, City of St Paul, Mikko Norman, Jordan Wild, Nathaniel Younce. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Edwards, Anthony)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota, Ramsey County, case number 62-CV-20-1383 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7555761) filed by Nathaniel Younce, City of St Paul, Mikko Norman, Todd Axtell, Jordan Wild. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Edwards, Anthony) Modified text on 3/13/2020 (MTP).
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. COMPLAINT against Kim Diane Handy Jones (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7555470) filed by Kim Diane Handy Jones. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Edwards, Anthony) Modified text on 3/11/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handy Jones v. City of St. Paul, Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Wild
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Axtell
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Younce
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Paul, Minnesota
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikko Norman
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Diane Handy Jones
Represented By: Paul J Bosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?