Siddiqui et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Petitioner: M. Siddiqui, Ever F. Hernandez, Fairo E Navarro Garcia, Balde Mamadou B, Hillary Kirni, Rodrigo Navrid, Oscsar Rojas-Martinez, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Pedro Cuchil Motom, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Abdinajib Warsame, Boucka Mbindjou, Firua Ibarra Amador, Zacarias Maroquin William, Inemo S. Clement, Jorge Vallecino, Riger Adus, Isa Kabala, Saidi Obara, Edmond Lewis, Ilyas Jama, Mario Sandiez, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Gregorio Montejo Garcia, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Omar A. Castro, Blama J Koilor, Samuel Larios Jose, Nfotobong Marcel, Jose Guaman Chimborazo, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui, Oscar A Fuentes Cara, David Sharif Daud, Yaasiin Ishaaq, Abdirahman Ahmed, Pavh Day, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Imagcelo Ramirez, Sonvour Victor, Pineda-Mendoza, Angel Oman, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Diego Lear Ciprian, Zakari Latif, Danny Sonteliz, Mohamed Mohamed, Edwin Sanchez, Jose Moreno, Jose Eloy Comacho B, Jeremiah J Nimaly, Kwafi Ampofo, Samatar A Nasir, Josi Marilan, Rudra Newfame, Sergio Gallego, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Abdihajir Sigar, Angel Reyes, Benito Juarez, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez M., Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Sauveur Victor, Abdihaijur Sigar, Fairo E. Navarro Garcia, Hillary Kirui, Jose Guaman Chimboraz, Amged Omran, Oscar Rojas-Martinez, Blama Koilor, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez, Emad Al Rousan, Benito Juarez-Ferrer, Mohammed A.S. Hasan Karamah, Ever E. Hernandez, Oscar A. Fuentes Cara, Jeremiah J. Nimaly, Daud Sharif Daud, Balde Mamadou, Mohammed Siddiqui, Gregorio Montoya Garcia, Elder Ezequiel Giron Ramirez, Fernando Cruz Zeferino, Yaasiin Aweis-Isxaaq, Pedro Chuchil Motom, Marcel Nfotabong, Zacarias William, Jose Pineda-Mendoza, Samatar A. Nasir, Boucka Mbindijou and Inemo Clement
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Joel Brott
Amicus Curiae: The Advocates for Human Rights
Case Number: 0:2020cv00793
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 1. The parties' objections to the Report and Recommendation #98 #99 are OVERRULED; 2. The Report and Recommendation #94 is ACCEPTED; and 3. Petitioners' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction #43 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/14/2020. (KMW)
May 13, 2020 Filing 124 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Immigration and Customs Enforcement . (Fuller, David)
May 8, 2020 Filing 108 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Joel Brott . (Sime, Timothy)
May 7, 2020 Filing 107 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #98 Report and Recommendation filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fuller, David)
May 6, 2020 Filing 106 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. WILL REFILE. RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #98 Report and Recommendation filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fuller, David) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (CLK).
May 6, 2020 Filing 105 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #98 Report and Recommendation filed by Joel Brott filed by Joel Brott. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sime, Timothy)
May 6, 2020 Filing 104 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #99 Report and Recommendation Petitioners' Response to Federal Respondents' Objections to Report and Recommendation.(Goetz, Frederick)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER. Pursuant to the Parties' stipulation #101 : Both Parties shall have until May 6, 2020, to respond to any objections regarding the April 28, 2020, Report and Recommendation #94 . Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/6/2020.(KMW)
May 6, 2020 Filing 102 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #101 Stipulation,,,,,. (Goetz, Frederick)
May 6, 2020 Filing 101 STIPULATION re #97 Order on Stipulation Stipulation for Additional Time to Respond to Objections to Report and Recommendation by Fairo E. Navarro Garcia, Riger Adus, Abdirahman Ahmed, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui, Firua Ibarra Amador, Kwafi Ampofo, Yaasiin Aweis-Isxaaq, Oscar A. Fuentes Cara, Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Omar A. Castro, Jose Guaman Chimboraz, Diego Lear Ciprian, Inemo Clement, Jose Eloy Comacho B, Daud Sharif Daud, Pavh Day, Sergio Gallego, Gregorio Montoya Garcia, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Ever E. Hernandez, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Ilyas Jama, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez, Samuel Larios Jose, Benito Juarez-Ferrer, Isa Kabala, Mohammed A.S. Hasan Karamah, Hillary Kirui, Blama Koilor, Zakari Latif, Edmond Lewis, Balde Mamadou, Nfotobong Marcel, Josi Marilan, Boucka Mbindijou, Mohamed Mohamed, Jose Moreno, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Pedro Chuchil Motom, Samatar A. Nasir, Rodrigo Navrid, Rudra Newfame, Marcel Nfotabong, Jeremiah J. Nimaly, Saidi Obara, Angel Oman, Amged Omran, Pineda-Mendoza, Jose Pineda-Mendoza, Elder Ezequiel Giron Ramirez, Angel Reyes, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Oscar Rojas-Martinez, Emad Al Rousan, Edwin Sanchez, Mario Sandiez, Mohammed Siddiqui, Abdihaijur Sigar, Danny Sonteliz, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Jorge Vallecino, Sauveur Victor, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Abdinajib Warsame, Zacarias William, Fernando Cruz Zeferino. Jointly Signed by Respondent Joel Brott and Federal Respondents. (Goetz, Frederick)
May 2, 2020 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on 4/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (99 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Transcript temporarily sealed to determine if redactions are required. Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction or Notice that No Redaction is Required. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and the #Transcripts under NextGen ECF Reference Guides. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 5/11/2020. Redaction Request due 5/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2020. (LAS)
May 1, 2020 Filing 99 OBJECTION TO #94 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Repp, Liles)
May 1, 2020 Filing 98 OBJECTION TO #94 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION .(Goetz, Frederick)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. Respondents shall have until May 6, 2020, to respond to any objections regarding the April 28, 2020, Report and Recommendation [ECF No. 94]. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/30/2020.(KMW)
April 30, 2020 Filing 96 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #95 Stipulation. (Repp, Liles)
April 30, 2020 Filing 95 STIPULATION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Jointly Signed by ALL PETITIONERS, ALL OTHER FEDERAL RESPONDENTS, and JOEL BROTT. (Repp, Liles)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pineda-Mendoza, Oscar A. Fuentes Cara, Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Jose Eloy Comacho B, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Pedro Chuchil Motom, Inemo Clement, Nfotobong Marcel, Saidi Obara, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez, Josi Marilan, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Edwin Sanchez, Angel Oman, Ilyas Jama, Oscar Rojas-Martinez, Sauveur Victor, Mohammed A.S. Hasan Karamah, Jose Pineda-Mendoza, Jorge Vallecino, Abdihaijur Sigar, Yaasiin Aweis-Isxaaq, Samuel Larios Jose, Abdinajib Warsame, Isa Kabala, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Benito Juarez-Ferrer, Daud Sharif Daud, Angel Reyes, Pavh Day, Jeremiah J. Nimaly, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Blama Koilor, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Mohamed Mohamed, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Jose Guaman Chimboraz, Hillary Kirui, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Fairo E. Navarro Garcia, Abdirahman Ahmed, Rodrigo Navrid, Marcel Nfotabong, Danny Sonteliz, Edmond Lewis, Zacarias William, Elder Ezequiel Giron Ramirez, Riger Adus, Mario Sandiez, Balde Mamadou, Gregorio Montoya Garcia, Kwafi Ampofo, Amged Omran, Boucka Mbindijou, Jose Moreno, Fernando Cruz Zeferino, Zakari Latif, Mohammed Siddiqui, Firua Ibarra Amador, Omar A. Castro, Emad Al Rousan, Samatar A. Nasir, Rudra Newfame, Ever E. Hernandez, Sergio Gallego, Diego Lear Ciprian, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/28/2020.(TMA)
April 28, 2020 Filing 93 CHANGE for #92 Transcript Request: need the transcript sooner by Immigration and Customs Enforcement to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Fuller, David)
April 28, 2020 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #74 Motion Hearing,,,,,, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Fuller, David)
April 27, 2020 Filing 91 SEALED LETTER to District Judge by Hillary Kirui. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(kt)
April 24, 2020 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Final Redacted Declaration of Detainees in Response to Second Affidavit of Brian Frank re #76 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion by Fairo E. Navarro Garcia, Riger Adus, Abdirahman Ahmed, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui, Firua Ibarra Amador, Kwafi Ampofo, Yaasiin Aweis-Isxaaq, Oscar A. Fuentes Cara, Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Omar A. Castro, Jose Guaman Chimboraz, Diego Lear Ciprian, Inemo Clement, Jose Eloy Comacho B, Daud Sharif Daud, Pavh Day, Sergio Gallego, Gregorio Montoya Garcia, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Ever E. Hernandez, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Ilyas Jama, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez, Samuel Larios Jose, Benito Juarez-Ferrer, Isa Kabala, Mohammed A.S. Hasan Karamah, Hillary Kirn, Blama Koilor, Zakari Latif, Edmond Lewis, Balde Mamadou, Nfotobong Marcel, Josi Marilan, Boucka Mbindijou, Mohamed Mohamed, Jose Moreno, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Pedro Chuchil Motom, Samatar A. Nasir, Rodrigo Navrid, Rudra Newfame, Marcel Nfotabong, Jeremiah J. Nimaly, Saidi Obara, Angel Oman, Amged Omran, Pineda-Mendoza, Jose Pineda-Mendoza, Elder Ezequiel Giron Ramirez, Angel Reyes, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Oscar Rojas-Martinez, Emad Al Rousan, Edwin Sanchez, Mario Sandiez, Mohammed Siddiqui, Abdihaijur Sigar, Danny Sonteliz, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Jorge Vallecino, Sauveur Victor, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Abdinajib Warsame, Zacarias William, Fernando Cruz Zeferino . (Goetz, Frederick)
April 24, 2020 Filing 89 RESPONSE re #76 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion PETITIONERS' RESPONSE TO PARAGRAPHS 24-37 OF THE SECOND AFFIDAVIT OF BRIAN FRANK. (Attachments: #1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Exhibit(s) Final Redacted Detainee Declaration in Response to Second Affidavit of Brian Frank)(Goetz, Frederick) Modified text on 4/24/2020 (CLK).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part #85 Petitioners' Motion. Petitioners have requested permission to file a declaration responsive to the April 23, 2020 declaration of Brian Frank, specifically paragraphs 1, 12, 14, 16, and 23, and a response to paragraphs 24-37. (Dkt. 85.) The request is GRANTED in part in so far as Petitioners may file the requested declaration and response on or before noon on April 27, 2020. No further submissions relating to Petitioners Motion for TRO or Preliminary Injunction will be entertained by the Court absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/24/2020. (SGK) Modified text on 4/27/2020 (KNK).
April 24, 2020 Filing 87 Redacted Document for #79 Federal Respondents' Sealed Surreply in Opposition to Motion for TRO filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Fuller, David)
April 24, 2020 Filing 86 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Joel Brott . (Sime, Timothy)
April 23, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION for Permission to File Responsive Declarations and to Strike filed by Fairo E. Navarro Garcia, Riger Adus, Abdirahman Ahmed, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui, Firua Ibarra Amador, Kwafi Ampofo, Yaasiin Aweis-Isxaaq, Oscar A. Fuentes Cara, Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Omar A. Castro, Jose Guaman Chimboraz, Diego Lear Ciprian, Inemo Clement, Jose Eloy Comacho B, Daud Sharif Daud, Pavh Day, Sergio Gallego, Gregorio Montoya Garcia, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Ever E. Hernandez, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Ilyas Jama, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez, Samuel Larios Jose, Benito Juarez-Ferrer, Isa Kabala, Mohammed A.S. Hasan Karamah, Hillary Kirn, Blama Koilor, Zakari Latif, Edmond Lewis, Balde Mamadou, Nfotobong Marcel, Josi Marilan, Boucka Mbindijou, Mohamed Mohamed, Jose Moreno, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Pedro Chuchil Motom, Samatar A. Nasir, Rodrigo Navrid, Rudra Newfame, Marcel Nfotabong, Jeremiah J. Nimaly, Saidi Obara, Angel Oman, Amged Omran, Pineda-Mendoza, Jose Pineda-Mendoza, Elder Ezequiel Giron Ramirez, Angel Reyes, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Oscar Rojas-Martinez, Emad Al Rousan, Edwin Sanchez, Mario Sandiez, Mohammed Siddiqui, Abdihaijur Sigar, Danny Sonteliz, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Jorge Vallecino, Sauveur Victor, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Abdinajib Warsame, Zacarias William, Fernando Cruz Zeferino. (Goetz, Frederick) Modified text on 4/24/2020 (MMP).
April 23, 2020 Filing 84 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #82 , #81 , #83 Sealed Document(s) - 81, 82, 83 - Declaration and Exhibits 1 and 2 . (Fuller, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 83 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 to the Sealed Declaration of David W. Fuller re #81 Sealed Document by Federal Respondents. (Fuller, David) Modified text on 4/24/2020 (MMP).
April 23, 2020 Filing 82 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 to the Sealed Declaration of David W. Fuller re #81 Sealed Document by Federal Respondents. (Fuller, David) Modified text on 4/24/2020 (MMP).
April 23, 2020 Filing 81 SEALED Declaration of David W. Fuller by Federal Respondents. (Fuller, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 80 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. Redacted Document for #79 Federal Respondents' Sealed Surreply in Opposition to Motion for TRO filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fuller, David) Modified text on 4/24/2020 (lmb).
April 23, 2020 Filing 79 SEALED REPLY re #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Federal Respondents. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fuller, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 78 Redacted Document for #77 Sealed Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Brian Frank filed by Joel Brott.(Sime, Timothy)
April 23, 2020 Filing 77 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Brian Frank re #76 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by Joel Brott.(Sime, Timothy)
April 23, 2020 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Brian Frank in OPPOSITION TO #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joel Brott.(Sime, Timothy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 75 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Immigration and Customs Enforcement . (Fuller, David)
April 21, 2020 Filing 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2020 re #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pineda-Mendoza, Oscar A. Fuentes Cara, Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Jose Eloy Comacho B, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Pedro Chuchil Motom, Inemo Clement, Nfotobong Marcel, Saidi Obara, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez, Josi Marilan, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Edwin Sanchez, Angel Oman, Ilyas Jama, Oscar Rojas-Martinez, Sauveur Victor, Mohammed A.S. Hasan Karamah, Jose Pineda-Mendoza, Jorge Vallecino, Abdihaijur Sigar, Yaasiin Aweis-Isxaaq, Samuel Larios Jose, Abdinajib Warsame, Isa Kabala, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Hillary Kirn, Benito Juarez-Ferrer, Daud Sharif Daud, Angel Reyes, Pavh Day, Jeremiah J. Nimaly, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Blama Koilor, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Mohamed Mohamed, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Jose Guaman Chimboraz, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Fairo E. Navarro Garcia, Abdirahman Ahmed, Rodrigo Navrid, Marcel Nfotabong, Danny Sonteliz, Edmond Lewis, Zacarias William, Elder Ezequiel Giron Ramirez, Riger Adus, Mario Sandiez, Balde Mamadou, Gregorio Montoya Garcia, Kwafi Ampofo, Amged Omran, Boucka Mbindijou, Jose Moreno, Fernando Cruz Zeferino, Zakari Latif, Mohammed Siddiqui, Firua Ibarra Amador, Omar A. Castro, Emad Al Rousan, Samatar A. Nasir, Rudra Newfame, Ever E. Hernandez, Sergio Gallego, Diego Lear Ciprian, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (TMA)
April 20, 2020 Filing 73 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #72 Response filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Repp, Liles)
April 20, 2020 Filing 72 RESPONSE re #65 Brief filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Repp, Liles) Modified text on 4/20/2020 (CLK).
April 17, 2020 Filing 71 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #70 Sealed Document(s) - #70 Sealed Affidavit in Support and [70-1] Sealed Exhibit 1, [70-2] Sealed Exhibit 2, .(Goetz, Frederick)
April 17, 2020 Filing 70 SEALED Third AFFIDAVIT of Frederick J. Goetz in SUPPORT OF #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioners-Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 2)(Goetz, Frederick)
April 17, 2020 Filing 69 Second AFFIDAVIT of Frederick J. Goetz in SUPPORT OF #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6)(Goetz, Frederick)
April 17, 2020 Filing 68 REPLY re #58 Response, #52 Response Petitioners' Reply to Respondents' Responses to Amended Habeas Petition and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.(Goetz, Frederick)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Remote Public Access to Motion Hearing on 4/21/2020 at 2:00 PM. If any member of the press or public would like to attend the telephonic April 21, 2020 hearing, they should email magistrate_wright_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to make appropriate arrangements. Pursuant to General Order Number 6, issued by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on March 31, 2020, "Members of the public and media are strictly prohibited from recording or broadcasting any hearing, in whole or in part, in any fashion." Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. SO ORDERED. (TMA)
April 16, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE/Complementary Documents for the Affidavit by Marcel Nfotabong (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Police Report, #2 Exhibit-Written Decision, #3 Exhibit-Proof of Appeal, #4 Envelope)(CLK) DOCUMENT QC'D BY LJG on 4/20/2020 (LJG).
April 16, 2020 Filing 65 BRIEF re #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus Curiae filed by The Advocates for Human Rights.(Manske, William)
April 16, 2020 Filing 64 SEALED LETTERS to Magistrate Judge. (kt) Modified text on 4/16/2020 (kt).
April 16, 2020 Filing 63 SEALED LETTERS to Magistrate Judge. (kt) Modified text on 4/16/2020 (kt).
April 16, 2020 Filing 62 SEALED LETTERS to Magistrate Judge. (kt) Modified text on 4/16/2020 (kt).
April 15, 2020 Filing 61 Redacted Document for #60 Sealed Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jeffrey L. Field . (Fuller, David)
April 15, 2020 Filing 60 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit B to Declaration of Jeffrey L. Field re #59 Declaration by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fuller, David)
April 15, 2020 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Jeffrey L. Field re #58 Response, by Immigration and Customs Enforcement . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fuller, David)
April 15, 2020 Filing 58 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fuller, David)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER on #50 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/15/2020. (TMA) Modified text on 4/16/2020 (KNK).
April 15, 2020 Filing 56 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Joel Brott re #52 Response filed by Joel Brott.(Sime, Timothy)
April 15, 2020 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Tim Sime in OPPOSITION TO #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joel Brott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sime, Timothy)
April 15, 2020 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of Joel Brott in OPPOSITION TO #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joel Brott.(Sime, Timothy)
April 15, 2020 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Brian Frank in OPPOSITION TO #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joel Brott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sime, Timothy)
April 15, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE re #19 Amended Petition (in a Civil Case) #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joel Brott.(Sime, Timothy) Modified text on 4/16/2020 (KNK).
April 15, 2020 Filing 51 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #50 Stipulation,. (Levish, Ellen)
April 15, 2020 Filing 50 STIPULATION Regarding Amicus Brief of the Advocates for Human Rights by The Advocates for Human Rights. Jointly Signed by Petitioners-Plaintiffs, Federal Respondent Immigrations and Customs Enforcement, and County Respondent Joel Brott. (Levish, Ellen)
April 14, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order #9 not re-sent to Danny Sonteliz. Envelope marked "Return to sender. Not in custody." Address unknown.(CLK)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: This case is before the Court on an emailed request by the Respondent for a one-day extension of the briefing schedule. Petitioners counsel does not object. The request is GRANTED. Respondents briefs shall be due on Wednesday, April 15, 2020 and Petitioners reply shall be due on Friday, April 17. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/20/2020. (TMA)
April 13, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order #9 not re-sent to Jose Eloy Comancho B. Envelope marked "Return to sender - not in custody."(CLK) Document QC'd on 4/20/2020 (CLK).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 20-cv-913 PJS/LIB has been reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/13/2020. (CLK)
April 10, 2020 Filing 123 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Jose Guaman Chimboraz as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 122 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Rodrigo Navrid as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 121 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Edwin Sanchez as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 120 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Angel Oman as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 119 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Firua Ibarra Amador as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 118 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Lusnif Nunez Vilanef as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 117 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Isa Kabala as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 116 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Imagcelo Ramirez as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 115 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Bernardo Guerrero Jensen as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 114 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 113 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Jose Sanchez Reyes as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 112 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Jeremiah J. Nimaly as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 111 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Josi Marilan as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Modified text on 5/12/2020 (MMG). Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 110 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Fernando Cruz Zeferino as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 109 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail not re-sent to Fairo E. Navarro Garcia as envelope states "Return to Sender-Not in Custody". (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 10, 2020 Filing 47 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .(Goetz, Frederick)
April 10, 2020 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #45 Memorandum in Support of Motion FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s))(Goetz, Frederick)
April 10, 2020 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support re #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Goetz, Frederick)
April 10, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2020 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Goetz, Frederick)
April 10, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Fairo E. Navarro Garcia, Riger Adus, Abdirahman Ahmed, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui, Firua Ibarra Amador, Kwafi Ampofo, Yaasiin Aweis-Isxaaq, Oscar A. Fuentes Cara, Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Omar A. Castro, Jose Guaman Chimboraz, Diego Lear Ciprian, Inemo Clement, Jose Eloy Comacho B, Daud Sharif Daud, Pavh Day, Sergio Gallego, Gregorio Montoya Garcia, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Ever E. Hernandez, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Ilyas Jama, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez, Samuel Larios Jose, Benito Juarez-Ferrer, Isa Kabala, Mohammed A.S. Hasan Karamah, Hillary Kirn, Blama Koilor, Zakari Latif, Edmond Lewis, Balde Mamadou, Nfotobong Marcel, Josi Marilan, Boucka Mbindijou, Mohamed Mohamed, Jose Moreno, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Pedro Chuchil Motom, Samatar A. Nasir, Rodrigo Navrid, Rudra Newfame, Marcel Nfotabong, Jeremiah J. Nimaly, Saidi Obara, Angel Oman, Amged Omran, Pineda-Mendoza, Jose Pineda-Mendoza, Elder Ezequiel Giron Ramirez, Angel Reyes, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Oscar Rojas-Martinez, Emad Al Rousan, Edwin Sanchez, Mario Sandiez, Mohammed Siddiqui, Abdihaijur Sigar, Danny Sonteliz, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Jorge Vallecino, Sauveur Victor, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Abdinajib Warsame, Zacarias William, Fernando Cruz Zeferino. (Goetz, Frederick)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #41 Letter to Magistrate Judge, Petitioners have filed a request for permission to exceed the word or line limits of LR 7.1(f)(1)(A) for their memorandum of law in support of their motion for TRO or preliminary injunction. (Dkt. 41.) The request is GRANTED. Respondents may make a request for a corresponding increase in the limits once the opening brief is filed and they have determined if an increase is needed. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/10/2020. (TMA)
April 9, 2020 Filing 41 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Fairo E. Navarro Garcia, Riger Adus, Abdirahman Ahmed, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui, Firua Ibarra Amador, Kwafi Ampofo, Yaasiin Aweis-Isxaaq, Oscar A. Fuentes Cara, Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Omar A. Castro, Jose Guaman Chimboraz, Diego Lear Ciprian, Inemo Clement, Jose Eloy Comacho B, Daud Sharif Daud, Pavh Day, Sergio Gallego, Gregorio Montoya Garcia, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Ever E. Hernandez, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Ilyas Jama, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez, Samuel Larios Jose, Benito Juarez-Ferrer, Isa Kabala, Mohammed A.S. Hasan Karamah, Hillary Kirn, Blama Koilor, Zakari Latif, Edmond Lewis, Balde Mamadou, Nfotobong Marcel, Josi Marilan, Boucka Mbindijou, Mohamed Mohamed, Jose Moreno, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Pedro Chuchil Motom, Samatar A. Nasir, Rodrigo Navrid, Rudra Newfame, Marcel Nfotabong, Jeremiah J. Nimaly, Saidi Obara, Angel Oman, Amged Omran, Pineda-Mendoza, Jose Pineda-Mendoza, Elder Ezequiel Giron Ramirez, Angel Reyes, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Oscar Rojas-Martinez, Emad Al Rousan, Edwin Sanchez, Mario Sandiez, Mohammed Siddiqui, Abdihaijur Sigar, Danny Sonteliz, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Jorge Vallecino, Sauveur Victor, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Abdinajib Warsame, Zacarias William, Fernando Cruz Zeferino . (Goetz, Frederick)
April 8, 2020 Filing 40 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ever E. Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd on 4/29/2020 (MMG).
April 8, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: finding as moot #17 Motion ; finding as moot #18 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; Telephone Conference held on 4/8/2020. For the reasons stated during the call, IT IS ORDERED THAT (1) Petitioners shall file their anticipated TRO motion on or before April 10, 2020; (2) Respondents shall file their response to the Amended Petition (Dkt. 19) and the TRO on or before April 14, 2020; (3) Petitioners shall file any reply on or before April 16, 2020; (4) the Pro Se filings at Dkts. 1, 17, and 18 are moot in view of the appointment of counsel, and Respondents need not reply to Dkts. 1, 17, and 18; and (5) the April 9, 2020 deadline for Respondents to reply to the initial pro se Petition (Dkt. 1) is vacated in view of the mootness of the initial Petition. (TMA)
April 8, 2020 Filing 20 ENTRY ENTERED IN ERROR - Amended Summons Issued as to Joel Brott, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (KNK) Modified text on 4/8/2020 (KNK). Modified text on 4/8/2020 (KNK).
April 7, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED PETITION against Joel Brott, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. filed by Boucka Mbindjou, Yaasiin Ishaaq, Angel Oman, Jose Guaman Chimborazo, Pedro Cuchil Motom, Ever F. Hernandez, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Abdinajib Warsame, Jose Moreno, Oscsar Rojas-Martinez, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez M., Sergio Gallego, Jorge Vallecino, Gregorio Montejo Garcia, Samuel Larios Jose, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Mohamed Mohamed, Isa Kabala, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Zacarias Maroquin William, David Sharif Daud, Omar A. Castro, Pineda-Mendoza, Rodrigo Navrid, Hillary Kirni, Edmond Lewis, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Oscar A Fuentes Cara, Jose Eloy Comacho B, Nfotobong Marcel, Ilyas Jama, Rudra Newfame, Edwin Sanchez, Diego Lear Ciprian, Abdirahman Ahmed, Benito Juarez, Saidi Obara, M. Siddiqui, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Josi Marilan, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Firua Ibarra Amador, Samatar A Nasir, Danny Sonteliz, Pavh Day, Abdihajir Sigar, Sonvour Victor, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui, Mario Sandiez, Kwafi Ampofo, Zakari Latif, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Inemo S. Clement, Jeremiah J Nimaly, Balde Mamadou B, Blama J Koilor, Angel Reyes, Riger Adus, Fairo E Navarro Garcia, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Imagcelo Ramirez. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F) (Goetz, Frederick)
April 6, 2020 Filing 39 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Isa Kabala as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 38 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Bernardo Guerrero Jensen as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 37 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to David Sharif Daudas address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 36 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 35 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Firua Ibarra Amador as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 34 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Jose Sanchez Reyes as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 33 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Fairo E Navarro Garcia as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 32 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Imagcelo Ramirez as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 31 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Danny Sonteliz as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 30 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Jose Eloy Comacho as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 29 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Zakari Latif as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 28 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Angel Oman as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 27 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Edwin Sanchez as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 26 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Josi Marilan as address is Vacant. Unable to forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Lusnif Nunez Vilanef as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 24 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Rodrigo Navrid as address is "Vacant. Unable to Forward." (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 23 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 not resent to Jose Guaman Chimborazo as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #7 ORDER not resent to Fernando Ulbano Mormo as address is Vacant. Unable to Forward. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Add my name to the list that is submitted to the court filed by Mohammed A.S. Hasan Karamah. (lmb) Document QC'd on 5/13/2020 (MMG).
April 6, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Urgent Release of Most Vulnerable Detainees - Compassionate Release filed by Riger Adus, Abdirahman Ahmed, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui, Firua Ibarra Amador, Kwafi Ampofo, Oscar A Fuentes Cara, Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Omar A. Castro, Jose Guaman Chimborazo, Diego Lear Ciprian, Inemo S. Clement, Jose Eloy Comacho B, David Sharif Daud, Pavh Day, Sergio Gallego, Fairo E Navarro Garcia, Gregorio Montejo Garcia, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Ever F. Hernandez, Yaasiin Ishaaq, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Ilyas Jama, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez M., Samuel Larios Jose, Benito Juarez, Isa Kabala, Hillary Kirni, Blama J Koilor, Zakari Latif, Edmond Lewis, Balde Mamadou B, Nfotobong Marcel, Josi Marilan, Boucka Mbindjou, Mohamed Mohamed, Jose Moreno, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Pedro Cuchil Motom, Samatar A Nasir, Rodrigo Navrid, Rudra Newfame, Jeremiah J Nimaly, Saidi Obara, Angel Oman, Pineda-Mendoza, Imagcelo Ramirez, Angel Reyes, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Oscsar Rojas-Martinez, Edwin Sanchez, Mario Sandiez, M. Siddiqui, Abdihajir Sigar, Danny Sonteliz, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Jorge Vallecino, Sonvour Victor, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Abdinajib Warsame, Zacarias Maroquin William. (lmb) Document QC'd on 5/13/2020 (MMG).
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Riger Adus, Abdirahman Ahmed, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui, Firua Ibarra Amador, Kwafi Ampofo, Oscar A Fuentes Cara, Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Omar A. Castro, Jose Guaman Chimborazo, Diego Lear Ciprian, Inemo S. Clement, Jose Eloy Comacho B, David Sharif Daud, Pavh Day, Sergio Gallego, Fairo E Navarro Garcia, Gregorio Montejo Garcia, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Ever F. Hernandez, Yaasiin Ishaaq, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Ilyas Jama, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez M., Samuel Larios Jose, Benito Juarez, Isa Kabala, Hillary Kirni, Blama J Koilor, Zakari Latif, Edmond Lewis, Balde Mamadou B, Nfotobong Marcel, Josi Marilan, Boucka Mbindjou, Mohamed Mohamed, Jose Moreno, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Pedro Cuchil Motom, Samatar A Nasir, Rodrigo Navrid, Rudra Newfame, Jeremiah J Nimaly, Saidi Obara, Angel Oman, Pineda-Mendoza, Imagcelo Ramirez, Angel Reyes, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Oscsar Rojas-Martinez, Edwin Sanchez, Mario Sandiez, M. Siddiqui, Abdihajir Sigar, Danny Sonteliz, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Jorge Vallecino, Sonvour Victor, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Abdinajib Warsame, Zacarias Maroquin William. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd on 5/13/2020 (MMG).
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. AMENDED PETITION against Joel Brott, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. filed by Boucka Mbindjou, Yaasiin Ishaaq, Abdirahman Ahmed, Angel Oman, Jose Guaman Chimborazo, Pedro Cuchil Motom, Ever F. Hernandez, Saidi Obara, Benito Juarez, M. Siddiqui, Fernando Ulbano Mormo, Alexis Gomez-Galera, Abdinajib Warsame, Jose Moreno, Oscsar Rojas-Martinez, Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez M., Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa, Josi Marilan, Sergio Gallego, Jorge Vallecino, Bernardo Guerrero Jensen, Gregorio Montejo Garcia, Firua Ibarra Amador, Samatar A Nasir, Danny Sonteliz, Samuel Larios Jose, Ignacio Garcia-Mara, Mohamed Mohamed, Isa Kabala, Pavh Day, Jose Sanchez Reyes, Abdihajir Sigar, Sonvour Victor, Mario Sandiez, Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui, Zacarias Maroquin William, David Sharif Daud, Kwafi Ampofo, Omar A. Castro, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef, Pineda-Mendoza, Zakari Latif, Jeremiah J Nimaly, Inemo S. Clement, Rodrigo Navrid, Hillary Kirni, Balde Mamadou B, Edmond Lewis, Angel Reyes, Cordoba Hector Ivar, Blama J Koilor, Riger Adus, Oscar A Fuentes Cara, Fairo E Navarro Garcia, Jose Eloy Comacho B, Adrian Romero Valdivia, Nfotobong Marcel, Ilyas Jama, Rudra Newfame, Edwin Sanchez, Imagcelo Ramirez, Diego Lear Ciprian. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F) (Goetz, Frederick) Modified text on 4/7/2020 (MKB).
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #13 Letter to Magistrate Judge.This case is before the Court on Respondent Joel Brotts unopposed request that he be permitted to limit his response to the facts relating to the condition of the jail and the steps taken by the jail in response to the COVID-19 pandemic, and relieve him of any obligation to identify the lawfulness of Petitioners continued detention under federal law (Dkt. 13). The request is GRANTED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/6/2020. (TMA)
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Joel Brott requesting clarification of March 26, 2020 Order. (Sime, Timothy)
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Text Only Order (Dkt # 6 ) sent to Angel Oman, Mario Sandiez, Rodrigo Navrid, Imagcelo Ramirez, Danny Sonteliz, Josi Marilan, Riger Adus, Firua Ibarra Amador, Lusnif Nunez Vilanef at Sherburne County Jail, 13880 Business Center Dr., Elk River, MN 55330, has been returned as "Return to Sender, Not In Custody". (lmb) Modified text on 4/6/2020 (lmb). Document QC'd on 5/12/2020 (MMG).
April 3, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order 6 not re-sent to Lusnif Nunez Vilanef. Envelope states: Return to sender, not in custody. Address unknown.(CLK)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Sime on behalf of Joel Brott. (Sime, Timothy)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPOINTING CO-COUNSEL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Beth Louise Lacanne, Attorney No. 0397023, is hereby appointed as co-counsel pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006A to represent petitioners in preparing a reply memorandum addressing the legal issues arising from the COVID-19 pandemic. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/2/2020. (CLK) Modified text on 4/6/2020 (lmb).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 20-cv-857 PJS/DTS has been reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/2/2020. (CLK)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Immigration and Customs Enforcement . (Attachments: #1 Attachment to letter)(Fuller, David)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Frederick Goetz, Attorney No. 185425, is hereby appointed pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006A to represent petitioners in preparing a reply memorandum addressing the legal issues arising from the COVID-19 pandemic. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/30/2020. (MMG) Modified text on 4/6/2020 (lmb).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-Only) ORDER: The Court issued an Order on March 26, 2020 setting a briefing schedule in this matterand adding Joel Brott, Sherburne County Sheriff, as a Respondent. (Dkt. 2.) The Clerk of Court is directed to add Joel Brott and the Sherburne County Attorneys Office to the case caption on CM/ECF and regenerate the NEF for Docket No. 2 after the caption is updated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/27/2020. (TMA)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #4 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance (Repp, Liles)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Liles Harvey Repp on behalf of Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Repp, Liles)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Fuller, David)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. 1.Each respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of the petitioners by no later than April 9, 2020, showing cause why the writ should not be granted in this case. 2.Respondents answers should include:a.Such affidavits and exhibits as are needed to establish the lawfulness of petitioners continued incarceration, in light of the issues raised in the petition; b.A reasoned memorandum of law and fact fully stating respondents legal position on petitioners claims, particularly in light of the COVID-19 pandemic; andc.Respondents recommendation on whether an evidentiary hearing should be conducted in this matter.3.If the petitioners intend to file a reply to respondents answers, they must do so by no later than April 16, 2020. Thereafter, no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as authorized by Court order.4.Petitioners are directed to submit the $5.00 filing fee for this matter or individual applications to proceed in forma pauperis within 14 days of the date of this order. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a).5.Counsel is hereby appointed pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006A to represent petitioners in preparing a reply memorandum addressing the legal issues arising from the COVID-19 pandemic. At least one petitioner must submit documentation (such as an application to proceed in forma pauperis) demonstrating his financial eligibility for appointment of counsel within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/26/2020. (TMA)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by M. Siddiqui. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Letter re Correspondence Address, #2 Attachment to Letter, #3 Exhibits (List of Detainees), #4 Envelope) (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by LJG on 3/25/2020.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siddiqui et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: M. Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ever F. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fairo E Navarro Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Balde Mamadou B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hillary Kirni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodrigo Navrid
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oscsar Rojas-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Sanchez Reyes
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pedro Cuchil Motom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fernando Ulbano Mormo
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alexis Gomez-Galera
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdinajib Warsame
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Boucka Mbindjou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Firua Ibarra Amador
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zacarias Maroquin William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Inemo S. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Vallecino
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Riger Adus
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isa Kabala
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saidi Obara
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edmond Lewis
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ilyas Jama
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Sandiez
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adrian Romero Valdivia
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregorio Montejo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bernardo Guerrero Jensen
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Omar A. Castro
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blama J Koilor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Larios Jose
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nfotobong Marcel
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Guaman Chimborazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonal Gutierrez Ajqui
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oscar A Fuentes Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Sharif Daud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yaasiin Ishaaq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdirahman Ahmed
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pavh Day
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lusnif Nunez Vilanef
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Imagcelo Ramirez
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sonvour Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pineda-Mendoza
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angel Oman
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ignacio Garcia-Mara
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diego Lear Ciprian
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zakari Latif
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny Sonteliz
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohamed Mohamed
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Sanchez
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Moreno
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Eloy Comacho B
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremiah J Nimaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kwafi Ampofo
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samatar A Nasir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Josi Marilan
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rudra Newfame
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sergio Gallego
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cordoba Hector Ivar
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdihajir Sigar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angel Reyes
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benito Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodolfo Martinez Caryayoa
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sauveur Victor
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdihaijur Sigar
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fairo E. Navarro Garcia
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hillary Kirui
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Guaman Chimboraz
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amged Omran
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oscar Rojas-Martinez
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blama Koilor
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fredi Emmanuel Jiminez
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emad Al Rousan
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benito Juarez-Ferrer
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohammed A.S. Hasan Karamah
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ever E. Hernandez
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oscar A. Fuentes Cara
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremiah J. Nimaly
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daud Sharif Daud
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Balde Mamadou
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohammed Siddiqui
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregorio Montoya Garcia
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elder Ezequiel Giron Ramirez
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fernando Cruz Zeferino
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yaasiin Aweis-Isxaaq
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pedro Chuchil Motom
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcel Nfotabong
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zacarias William
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Pineda-Mendoza
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samatar A. Nasir
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Boucka Mbindijou
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Inemo Clement
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Represented By: Beth Louise LaCanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joel Brott
Represented By: Kathleen A Heaney
Represented By: Timothy Sime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Advocates for Human Rights
Represented By: Rajin Olson
Represented By: William E. Manske
Represented By: Alyssa N Lawson
Represented By: Ellen Levish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?