Abdalla v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ali Abdalla
Defendant: Joel Brott, ICE Does 1-10, Peter Berg, William P. Barr, Matthew T. Albence, Chad F. Wolf, Timothy S. Robbins and United States of America
Case Number: 0:2020cv00809
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Ann D Montgomery
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Peter Berg, ICE Does 1-10, Timothy S. Robbins, United States of America, Chad F. Wolf. Jointly Signed by Ali Abdalla and Joel Brott.(Fuller, David)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/19/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Joel Brott. (Hiveley, Jason)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Peter Berg, ICE Does 1-10, Timothy S. Robbins, United States of America, Chad F. Wolf. (Fuller, David)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ali Abdalla. Joel Brott served on 3/31/2020. Answer due 4/21/2020. (Bratlie, Ian) Modified text on 4/1/2020 (MMP).
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Ali Abdalla. Chad Wolf Served on 3/27/2020 Answer due 5/26/2020. (Bratlie, Ian) Modified text on 4/1/2020 (MMP).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ann D. Montgomery recused. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-809 NEB/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 3/27/2020. (MMG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Joel Brott, ICE Does 1-10, Timothy S. Robbins, United States of America, Chad F. Wolf. (MMG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-809 ADM/ECW. (MMG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7594530) filed by Ali Mohamed Abdalla. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bratlie, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdalla v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Brott
Represented By: Stephanie A Angolkar
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Does 1-10
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Berg
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy S. Robbins
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Abdalla
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Teresa J Nelson
Represented By: Ian Bratlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?