Jenkins v. Pizza Hut et al
Plaintiff: Ardell Levert Jenkins
Defendant: Subway, Lund, Pizza Hut and Cub Foods
Case Number: 0:2020cv00820
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Report and Recommendation #3 is ACCEPTED. The action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepaying fees #2 is DENIED AS MOOT. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/12/2020.(KMW)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Ardell Levert Jenkins; #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ardell Levert Jenkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/6/2020. (KAT)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ardell Levert Jenkins. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/8/2020 (JGK).
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cub Foods, Lund, Pizza Hut, Subway filed by Ardell Levert Jenkins. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/8/2020 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Pizza Hut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardell Levert Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pizza Hut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cub Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?