Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. v. Mylan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Defendant: Medco Health Solutions Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Caremark LLC, CVS Health Corporation, OptumRx Holdings, LLC, Caremark Rx LLC, Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P., Optum Inc., CaremarkPCS Health LLC, United Healthcare Services Inc., Express Scripts Inc., OptumRX Inc. and United Health Group Incorporated
Case Number: 0:2020cv00827
Filed: March 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael John Lyle for Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., and for Medco Health Solutions Inc.; granting #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric Christopher Lyttle for Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., and for Medco Health Solutions Inc.; granting #33 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan Gordon Cooper for Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., and for Medco Health Solutions Inc.; granting #34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Carolyn L. Hart for Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., and for Medco Health Solutions Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/4/2020. (NAH)
May 1, 2020 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, Defendants Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., and Medco Health Solutions, Inc., hereby state as follows: Defendant Express Scripts, Inc., certifies, through its undersigned counsel, that its sole parent company is Express Scripts Holding Company and that no other publicly held corporation owns 10% more or more of its stock. Defendant Medco Health Solutions, Inc., certifies, through its undersigned counsel, that its sole parent company is Express Scripts Holding Company and that no other publicly held corporation owns 10% more or more of its stock. Defendant Express Scripts Holding Company certifies, through its undersigned counsel, that its sole parent company is Cigna Corporation and that no other publicly held corporation owns 10% more or more of its stock. Cigna Corporation has no parent corporation, and no publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. (Nelson, Jessica) Modified text on 5/4/2020 (MMP).
May 1, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carolyn L. Hart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7690966 filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., Medco Health Solutions Inc.. (Nelson, Jessica)
May 1, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan G. Cooper. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7690960 filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., Medco Health Solutions Inc.. (Nelson, Jessica)
May 1, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric C. Lyttle. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7690945 filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., Medco Health Solutions Inc.. (Nelson, Jessica)
May 1, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Lyle. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7690940 filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., Medco Health Solutions Inc.. (Nelson, Jessica)
May 1, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica J Nelson on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., Medco Health Solutions Inc.. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 30, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Express Scripts Holding Company waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; Express Scripts Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; Medco Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Curley, Andrew)
April 27, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Mylan Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; Mylan Specialty L.P. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Curley, Andrew)
April 27, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; Caremark LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; Caremark Rx LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; CaremarkPCS Health LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Curley, Andrew)
April 27, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Optum Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; OptumRX Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; OptumRx Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; United Health Group Incorporated waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; United Healthcare Services Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 OPTUMRX HOLDINGS, LLC WAIVER OF SERVICE, #2 OPTUMRX, INC. WAIVER OF SERVICE, #3 UNITED HEALTH GROUP INCORPORATED WAIVER OF SERVICE, #4 UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. WAIVER OF SERVICE)(Curley, Andrew)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher M. First for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..; granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric Enger for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..; granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Russell Chorush for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/27/2020. (JGK)
April 24, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell A. Chorush. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7672974 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
April 24, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric J. Enger. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7672959 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
April 24, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher M. First. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7672942 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Noah Silverman for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas Urban for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/10/2020. (JGK)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David C Raphael, Jr for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Susan C Segura for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bruce E Gerstein for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David S. Golub for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/8/2020. (JGK)
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David S. Golub. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7621980 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas Urban. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7613428 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bruce E. Gerstein. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7613419 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noah Silverman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7613410 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan C. Segura. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7613400 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David C. Raphael, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7613379 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven Bloch for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/2/2020. (NAH)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven L. Bloch. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7610526 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter Kohn for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Aurelia Chaudhury for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew C Curley for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David F Sorensen for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc..; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph T Lukens for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/1/2020. (JGK)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph T. Lukens. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7606942 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David F. Sorensen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7606928 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew C. Curley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7606908 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aurelia Chaudhury. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7606891 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter R. Kohn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7606860 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Drake, E)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Peter Kohn, Joseph T. Lukens, David F. Sorensen, David Golub, Steven Bloch, Bruce E. Gerstein, Noah Silverman, Stuart E. Des Roches, Susan Segura, David C. Raphael, Jr. as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Optum Inc., OptumRX Inc., OptumRx Holdings, LLC, United Healthcare Services Inc. (CLK)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, Caremark Rx LLC, CaremarkPCS Health LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc., Medco Health Solutions Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P., United Health Group Incorporated. (CLK)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-827 ECT/TNL. (CLK)
March 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark, LLC, CaremarkPCS Health, LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty, L.P., Optum Inc., OptumRX Inc., OptumRx Holdings, LLC, United Health Group Incorporated, United HealthCare Services, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7600282) filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Drake, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. v. Mylan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Represented By: E Michelle Drake
Represented By: Joseph T Lukens
Represented By: Aurelia Chaudhury
Represented By: Noah Silverman
Represented By: Christopher M. First
Represented By: Steven Bloch
Represented By: Eric Enger
Represented By: Andrew C Curley
Represented By: Peter Kohn
Represented By: David F Sorensen
Represented By: Russell Chorush
Represented By: Bruce E Gerstein
Represented By: Nicholas Urban
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: David C Raphael, Jr
Represented By: Susan C Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medco Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Jessica J Nelson
Represented By: Randi J Winter
Represented By: Eric Christopher Lyttle
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Carolyn L. Hart
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Jessica J Nelson
Represented By: Randi J Winter
Represented By: Eric Christopher Lyttle
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Carolyn L. Hart
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Specialty L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Jessica J Nelson
Represented By: Randi J Winter
Represented By: Eric Christopher Lyttle
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Carolyn L. Hart
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?