Ratcliff et al v. Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., as Debtor-in-Possession et al
Appellee: Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., as Debtor-in-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., as Debtor-in-Possession and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., the
Appellant: James L. Ratcliff and Great Western Bank
Case Number: 0:2020cv00835
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 Appellant's Appendix and Exhibits A-S by James L. Ratcliff. (Edstrom, Kenneth) Modified text on 5/6/2020 (KDS).
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 Appellant's BRIEF by James L. Ratcliff. (Edstrom, Kenneth)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven W Golden for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., the.; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Colin Robert Robinson for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., the.; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bradford Jay Sandler for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., the. Approved by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/27/2020. (JGK)
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradford Sandler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7672918 filed by Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., as Debtor-in-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colin Robinson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7672909 filed by Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., as Debtor-in-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven Golden. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7672894 filed by Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., as Debtor-in-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron A Lallier on behalf of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., as Debtor-in-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.. (Lallier, Cameron)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (lmb)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(SMD)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 2/20/2020. Court Reporter: Susan Newsom. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2020.(SMD)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF ISSUES by Appellant James L. Ratcliff.(SMD)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin M Wolpert on behalf of James L. Ratcliff. (Wolpert, Robin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Demetria Laparis Dyer on behalf of James L. Ratcliff. (Dyer, Demetria)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig T Dokken on behalf of James L. Ratcliff. (Dokken, Craig)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-835 NEB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 3/31/2020. (MMG)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Bankruptcy Court Case Number 19-32928.(SMD)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Bankruptcy list. Please use case number 20-cv-835 PAM. (kt)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-32928. filed by James L. Ratcliff. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice on Appeal, #2 Election to U.S. District Court, #3 Identification of Residence, #4 Memorandum, #5 Judgment, #6 Bky Docket) (SMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratcliff et al v. Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., as Debtor-in-Possession et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., as Debtor-in-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.
Represented By: Thomas J Lallier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., as Debtor-in-Possession
Represented By: Thomas J Lallier
Represented By: Cameron A Lallier
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Klobucar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., the
Represented By: Colin Robert Robinson
Represented By: Bradford Jay Sandler
Represented By: Steven W Golden
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Klobucar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James L. Ratcliff
Represented By: Kenneth C. Edstrom
Represented By: Mark V Steffenson
Represented By: Craig T Dokken
Represented By: Demetria Laparis Dyer
Represented By: Robin M Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Great Western Bank
Represented By: Stephen M Mertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?