Olthoff v. Warnygora et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Michael Olthoff
Defendant: City of Cloquet, the, City of Moose Lake, the, Carlton County and Jason Warnygora
Case Number: 0:2020cv00956
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #5 Stipulation. Carlton County answer due 6/25/2020; City of Cloquet, the answer due 6/25/2020; City of Moose Lake, the answer due 6/25/2020; Jason Warnygora answer due 6/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 5/1/2020.(JLB)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki A Hruby on behalf of Carlton County, Jason Warnygora. (Hruby, Vicki)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Flynn, Joseph)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Carlton County, Jason Warnygora. Jointly Signed by Shawn Michael Olthoff, City of Moose Lake, and City of Cloquet. (Flynn, Joseph)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Flynn on behalf of Carlton County, Jason Warnygora. (Flynn, Joseph)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carlton County, City of Cloquet, the, City of Moose Lake, the, Jason Warnygora. (MMP)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 5th Civil Righs list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-956 (ECT/LIB). (MMP)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlton County, City of Cloquet, City of Moose Lake, Jason Warnygora (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7651335) filed by Shawn Michael Olthoff. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bennett, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olthoff v. Warnygora et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cloquet, the
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Moose Lake, the
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton County
Represented By: Joseph E Flynn
Represented By: Vicki A Hruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Warnygora
Represented By: Joseph E Flynn
Represented By: Vicki A Hruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Michael Olthoff
Represented By: Andrew J Noel
Represented By: Kathryn H Bennett
Represented By: Robert Bennett
Represented By: Marc Betinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?