Daudt v. Anoka Hennepin Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Tanya Daudt
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Anoka Hennepin Credit Union, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Trans Union LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00965
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/12/2020.(KAT)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/25/2020. Fact Discovery due by 1/22/2021. Expert Discovery due by 4/22/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 1/29/2021. Motions (disp) due by 6/22/2021. Ready for trial due by 10/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/12/2020.(KAT)
June 12, 2020 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Anoka #31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Weimerskirch, Douglas)
June 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tanya Daudt (Weimerskirch, Douglas)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/10/2020.(KAT)
June 9, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
June 9, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Settlement by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Hoglund, Lauren)
June 8, 2020 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #26 Stipulation. (Weimerskirch, Douglas)
June 8, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Tanya Daudt. Jointly Signed by Trans Union, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Weimerskirch, Douglas)
June 8, 2020 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Tanya Daudt. Jointly Signed by Trans Union, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Weimerskirch, Douglas)
June 1, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Settlement as to ANOKA HCU ONLY by Tanya Daudt (Weimerskirch, Douglas)
May 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Mark Weimerskirch on behalf of Tanya Daudt. (Weimerskirch, Douglas)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #19 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer the Complaint. Anoka Hennepin Credit Union answer due 6/1/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/11/2020.(KAT)
May 11, 2020 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Anoka Hennepin Credit Union. (Duffek, Daniel)
May 11, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 Stipulation. (Duffek, Daniel)
May 11, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer the Complaint for Defendant Anoka Hennepin Credit Union by Anoka Hennepin Credit Union. Jointly Signed by Tanya Daudt. (Duffek, Daniel)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SEEKING 26(f) REPORT: Rule 26 Meeting Report and confidential letters due by 6/11/2020. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/11/2020.(KAT)
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC. (Brady, Scott)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (TEXT ONLY) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 6/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/5/2020. (KAT)
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Hoglund, Lauren)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Equifax Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James P Joseph, II for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/4/2020. (NAH)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER on #7 Stipulation of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 6/9/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/30/2020.(KAT)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. Joseph II. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7687769 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Experian PLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Tanya Daudt. (Myers, Gregory)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott Edwin Brady for Trans Union LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/27/2020. (JGK)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott E. Brady. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7672776 filed by Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Trans Union LLC. TransUnion is a corporate parent of Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anoka Hennepin Credit Union, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC. (kt)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-965 NEB/KMM. (kt)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anoka Hennepin Credit Union, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Trans Union LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7653324) filed by Tanya Daudt. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bursell, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daudt v. Anoka Hennepin Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Represented By: Christopher J Haugen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anoka Hennepin Credit Union
Represented By: Daniel M Duffek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Scott Edwin Brady
Represented By: Bradley D Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: James P Joseph, II
Represented By: Gregory J Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Daudt
Represented By: Jeffrey J Bursell
Represented By: Douglas Mark Weimerskirch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?