Doe et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe and John Doe
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Laura B. Zuchowski
Case Number: 0:2020cv00985
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ENTRY ONLY NOTICE: The pretrial conference scheduled for Thursday, June 25, 2020 at 2:00 pm will be held by Zoom Video Conferencing instead of by telephone. Chambers will separately provide video conferencing instructions to all counsel of record. (MSK)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by John Doe, Jane Doe. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Chad F. Wolf served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Laura B. Zuchowski served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Ratkowski, Nicholas) Modified text on 5/14/2020 (KDS).
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Laura B. Zuchowski, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. filed by Plaintiffs. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Restricted Exhibits Plaintiff's Affidavit, #2 Restricted Exhibits I-485 Denial, #3 Restricted Exhibits 2012 RFE Response, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Ratkowski, Nicholas)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Friedrich A. P. Siekert on behalf of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf, Laura B. Zuchowski. (Siekert, Friedrich)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by John Doe, Jane Doe. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Chad F. Wolf served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Laura B. Zuchowski served on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe; Jane Doe re #4 Statement instead of Redacted Document, #5 Exhibit, #1 Complaint,, (Ratkowski, Nicholas)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 SEALED EXHIBIT Rev. Notice #1 re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Restricted Exhibits Rev. Notice #2, #2 Restricted Exhibits Rev. Notice #3)(Ratkowski, Nicholas)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #1 and #5 , Sealed Document(s) - #1 Sealed Complaint and [1-1] Sealed Exhibit A, [1-2] Sealed Exhibit B, [1-3] Sealed Exhibit C, [1-4] Sealed Exhibit D . Exhibits where re-filed under seal at entry #5 . (Ratkowski, Nicholas) Modified text on 4/29/2020 (KDS).
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf, Laura B. Zuchowski. (lmb)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-985 (ECT/BRT). (lmb)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT against Laura B. Zuchowski, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7666626) filed by Plaintiffs. Filer requests summons issued. ATTACHMENTS 1, 2, AND 3 FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE. (Attachments: #1 Restricted Exhibits Revocation Notice #1, #2 Restricted Exhibits Revocation Notice #2, #3 Restricted Exhibits Revocation Notice #3, #4 Restricted Exhibits Revocation Notice #4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet). (Ratkowski, Nicholas) Modified text on 4/22/2020 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Nicholas Ratkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Nicholas Ratkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura B. Zuchowski
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?