Pokuta-Ramirez v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kim Pokuta-Ramirez
Defendant: Bank of America Group Benefits Program, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan Trust and Bank of America Plan Administrator
Case Number: 0:2020cv01044
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/6/2020. (NAH)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Santos, Margaret)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7698204 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bank of America Group Benefits Program, Bank of America Plan Administrator, Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan Trust, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (KNK)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1044 (DSD/KMM). (KNK)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7684686) filed by Kim Pokuta-Ramirez. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmoll, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pokuta-Ramirez v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Group Benefits Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Plan Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Pokuta-Ramirez
Represented By: Zachary Schmoll
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?