Sun Country, Inc. v. DAL Global Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Sun Country, Inc.
Defendant: DAL Global Services, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01051
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING #22 ESI & Document Discovery Stipulation. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/12/2020.(KAT)
June 12, 2020 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #22 Stipulation. (Thomson, William)
June 12, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION by DAL Global Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Sun Country, Inc., D/B/A Sun Country Airlines. (Thomson, William)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/15/2020. Expert Discovery due by 5/1/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 2/1/2021. Motions (disp) due by 7/1/2021. Ready for trial due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/11/2020.(KAT)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/11/2020.(KAT)
June 11, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/11/2020. See Minutes for details. (KAT)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on #16 Stipulation on Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint and to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. DAL Global Services, LLC answer due 7/2/2020. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/10/2020.(DLO)
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation,. (Thomson, William)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Original Complaint and to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by DAL Global Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Sun Country, Inc., d/b/a Sun Country Airlines. (Thomson, William)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/2/2020.(KAT)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/2/2020.(KAT)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Protective Order by DAL Global Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Sun Country, Inc., d/b/a Sun Country Airlines. (Thomson, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by DAL Global Services, LLC. Jointly Signed by Sun Country, Inc., d/b/a Sun Country Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Thomson, William)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Sun Country, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fitzsimmons, Danielle)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DAL Global Services, LLC. filed by Sun Country, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C) (Fitzsimmons, Danielle)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by DAL Global Services, LLC.(Thomson, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by DAL Global Services, LLC.(Thomson, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by DAL Global Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Thomson, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Thomson, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by DAL Global Services, LLC. (Thomson, William)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DAL Global Services, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, and Exhibits 1 - 4 (Thomson, William)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(BJP)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1051 (DSD/KMM). (MMP)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-20-6110 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7686864) filed by DAL Global Services, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6) (Thomson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Country, Inc. v. DAL Global Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAL Global Services, LLC
Represented By: Peter J Schwingler
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Represented By: William Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Country, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Stenmoe
Represented By: Blair A Harrington
Represented By: Danielle W Fitzsimmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?