Sears v. Barrows et al
Plaintiff: Michael Sears
Defendant: Gene Hill, Rodrick Barrows and City of Isanti, the
Case Number: 0:2020cv01083
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Isanti, the, Gene Hill, Rodrick Barrows. City of Isanti, the waiver sent on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; Gene Hill waiver sent on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020; Rodrick Barrows waiver sent on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Flynn, Joseph)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Flynn on behalf of Gene Hill. (Flynn, Joseph)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P Hodkinson on behalf of Rodrick Barrows. (Hodkinson, Mark)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rodrick Barrows, City of Isanti, the, Gene Hill. (CLK)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1083 WMW/TNL. (CLK)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rodrick Barrows, City of Isanti, Gene Hill (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7696641) filed by Michael Sears. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Noel, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sears v. Barrows et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Hill
Represented By: Joseph E Flynn
Represented By: Patrick S Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodrick Barrows
Represented By: Mark P Hodkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Isanti, the
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sears
Represented By: Andrew J Noel
Represented By: Kathryn H Bennett
Represented By: Robert Bennett
Represented By: Marc Betinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?