Torres v. Hamm et al
Plaintiff: Kelli Jo Torres
Defendant: Evan Verbrugge, Dallas Hamm, Rock County, Shelley Douty and Rock County Sheriff Evan Verbrugge
Case Number: 0:2020cv01092
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Evan Verbrugge, Shelley Douty, Dallas Hamm, Rock County. Evan Verbrugge waiver sent on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020; Shelley Douty waiver sent on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020; Dallas Hamm waiver sent on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020; Rock County waiver sent on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (Flynn, Joseph)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Shelley Douty, Dallas Hamm, Rock County, Evan Verbrugge. (MMP)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Kelli Jo Torres. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bratlie, Ian)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shelley Douty, Dallas Hamm, Rock County, Evan Verbrugge. (KDS)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1092 DSD/ECW. (KDS)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7701336) filed by Kelli Jo Torres. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bratlie, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Hamm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Verbrugge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Hamm
Represented By: Joseph E Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock County
Represented By: Joseph E Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Douty
Represented By: Joseph E Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock County Sheriff Evan Verbrugge
Represented By: Joseph E Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Jo Torres
Represented By: Teresa J Nelson
Represented By: Ian Bratlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?