McCourt v. State of Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: Noah J. McCourt
Defendant: State of Minnesota and Tim Walz
Case Number: 0:2020cv01117
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/15/2020. (JMK)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (Attachment: Bowbeer Practice Pointers) (JMK)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Noah J. McCourt. (JGK) Document QC'd on 5/14/2020 (JGK).
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Minnesota, Tim Walz filed by Noah J. McCourt. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Document QC'd on 5/14/2020 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCourt v. State of Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah J. McCourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?