Ganrude v. Crowson
Plaintiff: Ronald J Ganrude
Defendant: Anthony James Crowson
Case Number: 0:2020cv01143
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Winona County District Court; enclosing Order of Remand. cc: Winona County District Court re #19 Order Remanding Case. (KNK)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 6/18/2020.(KMW)
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation,,. (Gardner, Robert)
June 17, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Dismiss/General , #8 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #10 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #11 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 2 Notice of Initial Case Assignment, #9 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #15 Letter to District Judge, #14 Meet and Confer Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #12 Proposed Order to Judge Stipulation Regarding Remand and Dismissal by Anthony James Crowson. (Gardner, Robert)
June 16, 2020 Filing 16 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. Based on the letter filed on 6/16/20 indicating the parties will be filing stipulation on the counterclaims and to remand the case back to state court, the hearing scheduled for 7/22/20 has been stricken from the Court Calendar. (KMW)
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Ronald J. Ganrude JOINT LETTER OF COUNSEL RE: STATUS OF MOTION TO REMAND-MOTION TO DISMISS. (Flynn, Joseph)
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court, Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Ronald J. Ganrude, Ronald J. Ganrude.(Flynn, Joseph)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: Due to the pending motion, there is good cause to delay the Rule 16 conference at this time. The Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2020 before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson is canceled. (MSK)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ronald J. Ganrude, Ronald J. Ganrude.(Hruby, Vicki)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of RONALD J. GANRUDE in SUPPORT OF #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ronald J. Ganrude, Ronald J. Ganrude.(Hruby, Vicki)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of VICKI A. HRUBY in SUPPORT OF #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ronald J. Ganrude, Ronald J. Ganrude. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hruby, Vicki)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ronald J. Ganrude, Ronald J. Ganrude. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hruby, Vicki)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Hruby, Vicki)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ronald J. Ganrude, Ronald J. Ganrude. (Hruby, Vicki)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki A Hruby on behalf of Ronald J. Ganrude. (Hruby, Vicki)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Flynn on behalf of Ronald J. Ganrude. (Flynn, Joseph)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 Anthony James Crowson's ANSWER to Complaint Petition to Revoke Permit, COUNTERCLAIM against Ronald J. Ganrude. filed by Anthony James Crowson. (Gardner, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-1143 NEB/BRT. (CLK)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7714719) filed by Anthony James Crowson. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Summons and Petition to Revoke Permit, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gardner, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ganrude v. Crowson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony James Crowson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J Ganrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?