Forsell v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Richard Forsell
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv01191
Filed: May 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of California. (lmb)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-212) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria.(lmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2020: #1 Certified Copy by Clerk of NDCA) (lmb).
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (MMP)
May 17, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1191 (ECT/HB). (MMP)
May 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7728608) filed by Richard Forsell. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forsell v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Forsell
Represented By: Charles H Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?