Rockwell v. Gorman et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Rockwell
Defendant: Laura Kelly Gorman, Anjeanette Cayot and Laura Kelly
Case Number: 0:2020cv01219
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Todd M. Lantz, Wesley T. Graham, Michael Hutchens Frasier as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt) cc: Todd M. Lantz, Wesley T. Graham, Michael Hutchens Frasier. (kt)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00060. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz per 3rd/4th Stockholders Suits Deck.
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to transfer case. Remand/Transfer Deadline set for 6/18/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 5/15/2020. (djy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 5/20/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 ***MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE*** to District of Minnesota by Cindy Rockwell. (Lantz, Todd) Modified on 5/4/2020 changed from stipulation to motion (don). [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 5/20/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Anjeanette Cayot, Laura Kelly Gorman. (Graham, Wesley) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/7/2020) (don). (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/7/2020) (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 5/20/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (tae) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 5/20/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Frasier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 2/26/2020. (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 5/20/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4071710 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Anjeanette Cayot, Laura Kelly Gorman. (Frasier, Michael) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 5/20/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT LOCAL RULE 81(a) STATEMENT by Anjeanette Cayot, Laura Kelly Gorman. (Graham, Wesley) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 5/20/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anjeanette Cayot, Laura Kelly Gorman from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL147019. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4067120., filed by Anjeanette Cayot, Laura Kelly Gorman. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Graham, Wesley) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 5/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockwell v. Gorman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kelly Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anjeanette Cayot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Rockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?