Ethiopian Airlines v. Alemayehu et al
Plaintiff: Ethiopian Airlines
Defendant: Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC and Henok A Degfu
Case Number: 0:2020cv01273
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lauren P. Russell for Hencock Alemayehu and for Ze Habesha, LLC.; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Derege Demissie for Hencock Alemayehu and for Ze Habesha, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/26/2020. (JGK)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Derege Demissie. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7820159 filed by Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Russell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7820090 filed by Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time. The Court finds good cause for a 60-day extension of time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Accordingly, Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/17/2020. (ALM)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Andreleita Walker on behalf of Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (Walker, Mary)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethiopian Airlines. Ze Habesha, LLC served on 5/30/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Tierney, Patrick)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethiopian Airlines. Hencock Alemayehu served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Tierney, Patrick)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC. (lmb)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1273 (ECT/HB). (lmb)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Hencock Alemayehu, Ze Habesha, LLC (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7757416) filed by Ethiopian Airlines. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - The Hidden Secrets of Ethiopian Airlines, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tierney, Patrick) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (lmb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 ENTRY FILED IN ERROR-REFILED AT DKT #2 . COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7757345) filed by Ethiopian Airlines. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - The Hidden Secrets of Ethiopian Airlines) (Tierney, Patrick) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ethiopian Airlines v. Alemayehu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hencock Alemayehu
Represented By: Mary Andreleita Walker
Represented By: Lauren P. Russell
Represented By: Derege Demissie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ze Habesha, LLC
Represented By: Mary Andreleita Walker
Represented By: Lauren P. Russell
Represented By: Derege Demissie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henok A Degfu
Represented By: Mary Andreleita Walker
Represented By: Lauren P. Russell
Represented By: Derege Demissie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethiopian Airlines
Represented By: Patrick T Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?