Latzke v. Silvercrest Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Curtis Latzke
Defendant: Silvercrest Properties, LLC and Silvercrest Properties, LLC doing business as Summit Place
Case Number: 0:2020cv01297
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Ann D Montgomery
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 8/26/2020. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 8/26/2020. Settlement Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/31/2020.(TJB)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2020. Fact Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 3/31/2021. Motions (disp) due by 4/30/2021. Ready for trial due by 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/24/2020.(TJB)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing.Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz is CANCELLED. A scheduling order will issue. (TJB)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Silvercrest Properties, LLC. Jointly Signed by Curtis Latzke.(Brinkman, Ellen)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 7/21/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 7/14/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/14/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Silvercrest Properties, LLC. (Conlin, Erin)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Silvercrest Properties, LLC. (Conlin, Erin)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Silvercrest Properties, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Brinkman, Ellen)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1297 ADM/DTS. (CLK)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin, case number Unassigned (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7768937) filed by Silvercrest Properties, LLC d/b/a Summit Place. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brinkman, Ellen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latzke v. Silvercrest Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvercrest Properties, LLC
Represented By: Erin Shanta Conlin
Represented By: Ellen A Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvercrest Properties, LLC doing business as Summit Place
Represented By: Erin Shanta Conlin
Represented By: Ellen A Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Latzke
Represented By: Lawrence P Schaefer
Represented By: Howard L Bolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?