Lomuscio v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Plaintiff: Dominic Lomuscio
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Case Number: 0:2020cv01308
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/23/2020. (NAH)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York. Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York waiver sent on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Santos, Margaret)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7820070 filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York. (Santos, Margaret)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York. (Santos, Margaret)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York. (MMP)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1308 (DSD/ECW). (MMP)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CIGNA Life Insurance Company of New York (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7775545) filed by Dominic Lomuscio. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kemmitt, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lomuscio v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Jake Elrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Lomuscio
Represented By: Michael John Kemmitt
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?